EP0668400 - Equipment for cleaning surfaces high above ground level such as vertical surfaces and vaults, even of complex contours, for example the walls of tunnels, road equipment, panels, etc. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pennatini, Carlo Località Roccamare - Lotto 24 I-58043 Castiglion della Pescaia (Grosseto) / IT | [1995/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Bardini, Marco Luigi, et al Società Italiana Brevetti SpA Corso dei Tintori, 25 50122 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | Bardini, Marco Luigi, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Corso dei Tintori, 25 I-50122 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 95830038.6 | 15.02.1995 | [1995/34] | Priority number, date | IT1994FI00032 | 17.02.1994 Original published format: IT FI940032 | [1995/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0668400 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E01H1/00 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
E01H1/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, SE [1995/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Flächen in grosser Entfernung vom Bodenniveau, wie vertikale Flächen, Gewölbe und auch komplexe Konturen, z.B. Tunnelwände, Strassenleiteinrichtungen und Platten | [1995/34] | English: | Equipment for cleaning surfaces high above ground level such as vertical surfaces and vaults, even of complex contours, for example the walls of tunnels, road equipment, panels, etc. | [1995/34] | French: | Equipement de nettoyage de surfaces au-dessus du niveau du sol telles que des surfaces verticales, des routes et même des contours complexes p.ex. des parols de tunnels des objets situés en bordure des voûtes et des panneaux | [1995/34] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 29.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/49] | 05.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2191451 (SOFRAIR [FR]) [Y] 8 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [A]EP0196978 (HARDY SA [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XAY]FR2584747 (MATERIEL DE VOIRIE [FR]) [X] 1-3,7 * the whole document * [A] 4,5 [Y] 8-10; | [Y]US5226629 (MILLMAN PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * abstract * |