EP0716956 - Collapsible luminous element for signalling a stationary vehicle, provided with a further intermittent signal light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biasci, Bruno Via Ferraris, 21 I-57013 Rosignano Solvay / IT | [1996/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/25] | Representative(s) | Massari, Marcello Studio M. Massari S.r.l. 46, Via di Campo Marzio 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | Massari, Marcello Studio M. Massari S.r.l. 23, Via Fontanella Borghese I-00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 95830094.9 | 13.03.1995 | [1996/25] | Priority number, date | IT1994RM00221 | 16.12.1994 Original published format: IT RM940221 | [1996/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0716956 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0716956 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | [1997/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0716956 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q7/00 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
B60Q7/00 (EP);
E01F9/615 (EP);
E01F9/654 (EP);
E01F9/688 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/25] | Title | German: | Leuchtelement mit zusätzlichem blinkendem Licht zum Anzeigen eines stehenden Fahrzeuges | [1996/25] | English: | Collapsible luminous element for signalling a stationary vehicle, provided with a further intermittent signal light | [1996/25] | French: | Elément lumineux pliant avec lumière intermittente supplémentaire pour signaler un véhicule à l'arrêt | [1996/25] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 06.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.01.1996 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.1996 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.1996 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1999 | 31.03.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   02.10.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.12.2001 | BE | 19.12.2001 | CH | 19.12.2001 | LI | 19.12.2001 | NL | 19.12.2001 | IE | 13.03.2002 | LU | 13.03.2002 | DK | 19.03.2002 | SE | 19.03.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
BE | 19.12.2001 | ||
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
IE | 13.03.2002 | ||
DK | 19.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
BE | 19.12.2001 | ||
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
IE | 13.03.2002 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
BE | 19.12.2001 | ||
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 19.12.2001 | |
CH | 19.12.2001 | ||
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 19.12.2001 | |
LI | 19.12.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 19.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2211025 (SARRAZIN NICOLE [FR]) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [X]US4489306 (SCOLARI JOHN E [US]) [X] 1-7 * column A; figures 1,2,6,8 *; | [X]FR2617450 (MINET FERDINAND [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0456007 (HORIZONT GERAETEWERK [DE]) [X] 1,7 * column A; figure 3 *; | [X]US5155667 (HO YIH-SHIN [TW]) [X] 1 * column A; figure 1.2 *; | [E]EP0656445 (SEGOBIA CLARO OMAR EUCARISTICO [AR], et al) [E] 1 * column A * |