EP0735459 - Fuzzy processor with improved architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consorzio per la Ricerca sulla Microelettronica nel Mezzogiorno - CoRiMMe Stradale Primosole, 50 95121 Catania / IT | [2003/38] |
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states CONSORZIO PER LA RICERCA SULLA MICROELETTRONICA NEL MEZZOGIORNO Stradale Primosole, 50 I-95121 Catania / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giacalone, Biagio Piazza Vittorio Emanuele, 33 I-91100 Trapani / IT | 02 /
Pappalardo, Francesco Via G.B.Nicolosi, 59 I-95047 Paterno'(Catania) / IT | 03 /
Pelos, Enrico Via P.Nenni, 49 I-90146 Palermo / IT | 04 /
Catania, Vincenzo Via Giacomo Leopardi, 1 I-95030 Sant'Agata li Battiati (Catania) / IT | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95830117.8 | 30.03.1995 | [1996/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0735459 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0735459 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/00 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
G06N7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/40] | Title | German: | Fuzzy-Prozessor-Architektur | [1996/40] | English: | Fuzzy processor with improved architecture | [1996/40] | French: | Architecture de processeur flou | [1996/40] | Examination procedure | 25.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 30.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 18.12.2003 | GB | 30.03.2004 | [2005/45] |
Former [2004/44] | DE | 18.12.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - KAZUO NAKAMURA ET AL, "FUZZY INTERFERENCE AND FUZZY INTERFERENCE PROCESSOR", IEEE MICRO, vol. 13, no. 5, pages 37 - 48, XP000397922 [X] 1-3,7,10-12,15-17 * page 44, column L, line 16 - column R, line 5; figure 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/40.238000 | [A] - ROSSMAN J, "DER REALISMUS KEHRT EIN", ELEKTRONIK, (19920818), vol. 41, no. 17, pages 40 - 46, XP000310952 [A] 3 * page 43, column L - page 44, column R; figure 2 * | [A] - J. ZHANG ET AL., "Mit Fuzzy: hohe Regelgeschwindigkeit", TECHNISCHE RUNDSCHAU, BERN CH, (19931203), vol. 85, no. 48, pages 30 - 32, XP000421024 [A] 7 * figure 4 * |