EP0772022 - Air pressure operated toy gun [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liang, Ching-Yao No. 53, Chung Hsing St. Hsin Shih Hsiang Tainan Hsuan / TW | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | For all designated states Liang, Ching-Yao No. 53, Chung Hsing St. Hsin Shih Hsiang, Tainan Hsuan / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/19] | Representative(s) | Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/19] | Roth, Ernst Adolf Michael, et al GÖTEBORGS PATENTBYRA AB Box 5005 402 21 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 95850191.8 | 03.11.1995 | [1997/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0772022 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F41B11/02, F41B11/32, F41A17/46 | [1997/19] | CPC: |
F41B11/56 (EP);
F41A17/46 (EP);
F41B11/721 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/19] | Title | German: | Luftdruckspielzeugpistole | [1997/19] | English: | Air pressure operated toy gun | [1997/19] | French: | Arme d'enfant fonctionnant à l'aide d'air comprimé | [1997/19] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/34] | 23.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.01.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2167538 (WEBLEY & SCOTT LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 95-107; figure . * * page 2, lines 8-26 *; | [A]US2765562 (ROPER WALTER F, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 30-57; figures 2,3 *; | [XA]EP0625689 (WESTERN ARMS CORP [JP]) [X] 5 * column 10, line 8 - column 13, line 13; figures 1-21C * * column 13, line 39 - column 14, line 45 * * column 23, lines 7-26 * [A] 3,4; | [X]EP0647825 (WESTERN ARMS CORP [JP]) [X] 5 * column 17, line 38 - column 21, line 8; figures 13-16 *; | [A]DE4103858 (HAEMMERLI AG [CH]) [A] 3 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH01167596 ; | [A]US3464399 (FISHER COLIN HORDLEY); | [A]US2881752 (BLAHNIK CARL E); | [A]US4819609 (TIPPMANN DENNIS J [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890928), vol. 13, no. 434, Database accession no. (M - 875)<3782>, & JP01167596 A 19890703 (FUARUKOON TOO K.K.) [A] * abstract * |