EP0674061 - Roof shingle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLIEM, Josef Bergstrasse 353 5571 Mariapfarr / AT | [1998/06] |
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states Josef Bliem Gesellschaft m.b.H. & Co. KG Bergstrasse 353 A-5571 Mariapfarr / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/06] |
Former [1995/39] | 01 /
Bliem, Josef Bergstrasse 353 A-5571 Mariapfarr / AT | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | Babeluk, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Albertgasse 10/8 A-1080 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 95890058.1 | 20.03.1995 | [1995/39] | Priority number, date | AT19940000606 | 22.03.1994 Original published format: AT 60694 | [1995/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0674061 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0674061 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04D1/18, E04D1/06 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
E04D1/18 (EP,US);
E04D1/2916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/39] | Extension states | SI | 11.04.1995 | Title | German: | Dachschindel | [1995/39] | English: | Roof shingle | [1995/39] | French: | Bardeau de toiture | [1995/39] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 06.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.05.1998 | FR | 27.05.1998 | GB | 27.05.1998 | NL | 27.05.1998 | DK | 27.08.1998 | SE | 27.08.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/45] | ES | 27.05.1998 | |
GB | 27.05.1998 | ||
NL | 27.05.1998 | ||
DK | 27.08.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 27.05.1998 | |
GB | 27.05.1998 | ||
NL | 27.05.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 27.05.1998 | |
GB | 27.05.1998 | ||
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/25] | GB | 27.05.1998 | |
SE | 27.08.1998 | ||
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | SE | 27.08.1998 | |
FR | 23.10.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | SE | 27.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3667184 (MERRILL CLIFFORD C, et al) [Y] 1,2,5 * figure - * [A] 3,4; | [DY]DE445123 (CHARLES VALDEMER HANSEN) [DY] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [A]BE393097 (P. COLLETTE) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0396380 (CARTER HOLT HARVEY ROOFING ALU [NZ]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 22; figure - *; | [A]US2482835 (BREMER WILLIAM S) [A] 1,2 * figure - *; | [DA]AT26343B (MAKART HANS) [DA] 3 * figure - *; | [DA]AT380716B (PLANNJA AB [SE]) [DA] 3,4 * figure 4 * |