EP0694359 - An immersed casting tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GESELLSCHAFT m.b.H. Turmstrasse 44 A-4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GESELLSCHAFT m.b.H. Turmstrasse 44 A-4020 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hohenbichler, Gerald, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Severinusstrasse 11/7 A-4470 Enns / AT | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Kopecky, Helmut Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Kopecky, Helmut Zollergasse 37/5, Postfach 201 A-1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 95890139.9 | 24.07.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | AT19940001470 | 25.07.1994 Original published format: AT 147094 | [1996/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694359 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694359 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/50 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
B22D41/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1996/05] | Title | German: | Tauchgiessrohr | [1996/05] | English: | An immersed casting tube | [1996/05] | French: | Tuyau de coulée par immersion | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 23.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 14.04.1999 | NL | 14.04.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 14.04.1999 | |
FR | 10.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | FR | 10.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]AT332579B (VOEST AG [AT]) [AD] 1 * figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [AD]JPS5847545 ; | [AD]AT331438B (VOEST AG [AT]) [AD] 1 * figures 1,3,4 *; | [AD]WO8912519 (DAVY DISTINGTON LTD [GB]) [AD] 1 * figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [XP]DE4319195 (DIDIER WERKE AG [DE]) [XP] 1 * figure 4; claims 1,6 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830603), vol. 7, no. 128, Database accession no. (M - 220), & JP58047545 A 19830319 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | AT332579B | JPS5847545 | AT331438B |