EP0726785 - DEVICE FOR MIXING A PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION WITH ANOTHER AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astra Aktiebolag 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [1996/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLAD, Lars, H kan, Christer Centrumvägen 20 S-430 31 Asa / SE | 02 /
KERS, Anders, Tore Myntstigen 2 S-151 48 Södertälje / SE | 03 /
RUDEN, Mats, Anders Bergstigen 20 S-436 42 Askim / SE | [1996/34] | Application number, filing date | 95900335.1 | 24.10.1994 | [1996/34] | WO1994SE00996 | Priority number, date | SE19930003630 | 03.11.1993 Original published format: SE 9303630 | SE19940001010 | 25.03.1994 Original published format: SE 9401010 | [1996/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9512424 | Date: | 11.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726785 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/178, A61M5/31, // A61D7/00 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
A61M5/284 (EP,US);
A61M5/3134 (EP,US);
A61M5/31596 (EP,US);
A61J1/2044 (EP,US);
A61J1/2096 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3104 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/34] | Extension states | LT | 03.06.1996 | SI | 03.06.1996 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN EINER PHARMAZEUTISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM ANDERENWIRKSTOFF | [1996/34] | English: | DEVICE FOR MIXING A PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION WITH ANOTHER AGENT | [1996/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MELANGE D'UNE COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE AVEC UN AUTRE AGENT | [1996/34] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 03.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 01.07.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0323109 (DIVERSEY CORP [CA], et al) |