EP0725968 - IMPROVED MULTIPLE-CORE ELECTRICAL IGNITION SYSTEM CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPLITFIRE, INC. 4065 Commercial Avenue Northbrook, IL 60062 / US | [1996/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOCHUM, Edwin, L. 11829 Maple Road Plymouth, IN 46563 / US | 02 /
OLSON, Richard, H. 15405 Tuxedo Drive Plymouth, IN 46563 / US | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95900432.6 | 24.10.1994 | [1996/33] | WO1994US12275 | Priority number, date | US19930145980 | 29.10.1993 Original published format: US 145980 | [1996/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9512205 | Date: | 04.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0725968 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0725968 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01C3/06, H01B7/00 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
H01B7/0063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [1998/33] |
Former [1996/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 20.05.1996 | SI | 20.05.1996 | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES MEHRFACHKERNKABEL FÜR ELEKTRISCHES ZÜNDSYSTEM | [1996/33] | English: | IMPROVED MULTIPLE-CORE ELECTRICAL IGNITION SYSTEM CABLE | [1996/33] | French: | AMELIORATION DE CABLE DE SYSTEME D'ALLUMAGE ELECTRIQUE A PLUSIEURS AMES | [1996/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.1996 | Search fee paid | 20.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 06.03.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4378550 (YOCHUM EDWIN L, et al) [Y] 1-4,13-15 * the whole document *; | [YA]US4700171 (COFFEY RONALD J [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 6,9-12,17,19,20; | [A]US5034719 (BROWN KARL M [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,9-11,13,15,19,20* column 2, line 26 - column 2, line 64; figures 1,2; claims 1M4M8-10,13,15-20 * | International search | [A]US534596 ; | [A]US2438006 (GUSTAFSON GILBERT E); | [A]US2577077 (FORSBERG GEORGE E); | [A]US3680027 (VITALE JOSEPH MICHAEL); | [A]GB2023328 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4514712 (MCDOUGAL JOHN A [US]); | [A]US4683349 (TAKEBE NORICHIKA [JP]); | [A]US4700171 (COFFEY RONALD J [US], et al); | [A]US4894490 (FUJIMOTO TERUTSUGU [JP]); | [A]US5061821 (NERCESSIAN KEVORK [DE]) |