EP0728321 - NON-RISING SUBMARINE OPTICAL CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POKORNY, Lothar Friedrich-Rückert-Strasse 27f D-96450 Coburg / DE | 02 /
SCHREY, Wolfgang Am Bodenholz 7 D-96465 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
PRIESNITZ, Ulrich Nelkenweg 38 D-96450 Coburg / DE | 04 /
OESTREICH, Ulrich Karl-Witthalm-Strasse 15 D-81375 München / DE | 05 /
SCHNEIDER, Lienhard Wildparkstrasse 1 D-96472 Rödental / DE | [1996/35] | Application number, filing date | 95900615.6 | 10.11.1994 | [1996/35] | WO1994DE01328 | Priority number, date | DE19934338761 | 12.11.1993 Original published format: DE 4338761 | [1996/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9513556 | Date: | 18.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728321 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0728321 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
G02B6/4427 (EP,US);
G02B6/4429 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT, SE [1996/35] | Title | German: | NICHTAUFSCHWIMMENDES OPTISCHES SEEKABEL | [1996/35] | English: | NON-RISING SUBMARINE OPTICAL CABLE | [1996/35] | French: | CABLE OPTIQUE SOUS-MARIN NON FLOTTANT | [1996/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 25.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE3403086 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2158264 (PIRELLI CAVI SPA) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [XA]US4765711 (OBST DONALD L [US]) [X] 1,6,8-10,13 * figure -; claim - * [A] 2-4,7,9,11,12; | [A]US5054881 (FISHER WILLIAM C [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * |