EP0724739 - RAISED ZONE RETROREFLECTIVE CUBE CORNER ARTICLE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Kenneth, L. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
BENSON, Gerald, M. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95901024.0 | 20.10.1994 | [1996/32] | WO1994US12110 | Priority number, date | US19930139448 | 20.10.1993 Original published format: US 139448 | [1996/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9511471 | Date: | 27.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724739 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724739 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/124 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
G02B5/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/32] | Title | German: | RETROREFLEKTIVER WÜRFELECKIGER KÖRPER MIT ERHÖHTEN ZONEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1996/32] | English: | RAISED ZONE RETROREFLECTIVE CUBE CORNER ARTICLE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | [1996/32] | French: | ARTICLE A TRIEDRES TRIRECTANGLES RETROREFLECHISSANT A ZONES SURELEVEES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 12.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.09.1999 | [2008/06] | Cited in | International search | [A]US3712706 (R.F.STAMM) [A] 1,2,21 * abstract * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 23 *; | [A]EP0342958 (MINISOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY) [A] 1,2,21 * abstract * * column 7, line 41 - line 65 *; | [A]US4066331 (HENRY LINDNER) [A] 1,2,21 * abstract * |