EP0764050 - CHROMIUM CATALYST AND CATALYTIC OXIDATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxy Vinyls L.P. 5005 LBJ Freeway Dallas, Texas 75244 / US | [2002/03] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states The Geon Company One Geon Center Avon Lake, Ohio 44012 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COWFER, Joseph, Allen 1115 Gentry Drive Medina, OH 44256 / US | 02 /
YOUNG, George, Hanson 129 Harwood Drive League City, TX 77573 / US | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 95901684.1 | 28.10.1994 | [1997/13] | WO1994US11628 | Priority number, date | US19940258293 | 10.06.1994 Original published format: US 258293 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9534379 | Date: | 21.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/54] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0764050 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764050 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/26, C01B7/01, A62D3/00, B01J37/08 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
A62D3/38 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/26 (EP,KR,US);
C01B7/01 (EP,KR,US);
A62D2101/20 (EP,US);
A62D2101/22 (EP,KR,US);
A62D2101/28 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P20/129 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/13] | Title | German: | CHROM-KATALYSATOR UND KATALYTISCHES OXYDATIONSVERFAHREN | [1997/13] | English: | CHROMIUM CATALYST AND CATALYTIC OXIDATION PROCESS | [1997/13] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE CHROME ET PROCEDE D'OXYDATION CATALYTIQUE | [1997/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 27.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.2002 | CH | 22.05.2002 | LI | 22.05.2002 | DK | 22.08.2002 | PT | 22.08.2002 | IE | 28.10.2002 | LU | 28.10.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/01] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
DK | 22.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
IE | 28.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
DK | 22.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
PT | 22.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 22.05.2002 | |
CH | 22.05.2002 | ||
LI | 22.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 22.05.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3989807 (JOHNSTON EARNEST L); | [DA]GB1506238 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [DA] 1-30 * page 2, line 28 - line 52 * * page 3, line 13 - line 25 * * claims 1-17 *; | [A]US4130505 (NASSER JR BENNY E, et al) [A] 1-30 * column 2, line 31 - line 55 *; | [X]EP0184413 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 1-30 * page 6, line 1 - line 15 * * page 10, line 17 - page 12, line 8 * * page 20; example 1 * * page 24; example 16; table 5 * * abstract * |