EP0733187 - OXYGEN-FUEL BURNER WITH INTEGRAL STAGED OXYGEN SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAXON CORPORATION 201 East 18th Street Muncie Indiana 47302 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states MAXON CORPORATION 201 East 18th Street Muncie, Indiana 47302 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, Curtis, L. 5201 West Tamarac Drive Muncie, IN 47304 / US | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Adkins, Michael Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | Adkins, Michael Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95901757.5 | 02.11.1994 | [1996/39] | WO1994US12638 | Priority number, date | US19930163424 | 08.12.1993 Original published format: US 163424 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9516880 | Date: | 22.06.1995 | [1995/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0733187 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0733187 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.07.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/46 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
F23D11/102 (EP,US);
F23C6/045 (EP,US);
F23C7/02 (EP,US);
F23D11/106 (EP,US);
F23D14/32 (EP,US);
F23C2201/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/39] | Title | German: | SAUERSTOFF-BRENNSTOFF-BRENNER MIT INTEGRIERTER GESTUFTER SAUERSTOFFZUFUHR | [1996/39] | English: | OXYGEN-FUEL BURNER WITH INTEGRAL STAGED OXYGEN SUPPLY | [1996/39] | French: | BRULEUR D'OXYGENE-COMBUSTIBLE AVEC ALIMENTATION EN OXYGENE INTERNE ETAGEE | [1996/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1996 | Search fee paid | 09.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.04.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 23.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.01.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 03.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24] | Request for further processing for: | 30.10.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 30.10.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5634006 ; | [X]US4583936 (KRIEGER DAVID A [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 30; figures 2-4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810606), vol. 005, no. 087, Database accession no. (M - 072), & JP56034006 A 19810406 (NIPPON FURNACE KOGYO KAISHA LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4351632 (NAGAI KIYOKAZU); | [A]US4690635 (COPPIN WILLIAM [US]); | [A]US4986748 (BROWN JOHN T [US], et al); | [Y]US5092760 (BROWN JOHN T [US], et al); | [XPY]US5269679 (SYSKA ANDREW J [US], et al) | [A] - NORTH AMERICAN COMBUSTION HANDBOOK, A Basic Reference on the Art and Science of Industrial Heating with Gaseous and Liquid Fuels, Volume 1: Combustion, Fuels, Stoichiometry, Heat Transfer, Fluid Flow, "Oxygen Enrichment", pages 76-79, Third Edition 1978, NORTH AMERICAN MFG. CO. CLEVELAND OHIO, US. | [A] - COMBUSTION TECHNOLOGY MANUAL, "Oxygen-Enriched and Oxy-Fuel Combustion", pages 316-327, Fourth Edition 1988, THE COMBUSTION DIVISION OF THE INDUSTRIAL HEATING EQUIPMENT ASSOCIATION, Arlington, VA. |