EP0729530 - SEGMENTED WOOD CHIP CRACKING ROLL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3513 Concord Pike, Suite 3001 Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3513 Concord Pike, Suite 3001 Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIELAGUS, Joseph B. 21508 S.W. Christiansen Tualatin, OR 97062 / US | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 95901812.8 | 08.11.1994 | [1996/36] | WO1994US12845 | Priority number, date | US19930153251 | 16.11.1993 Original published format: US 153251 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514133 | Date: | 26.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0729530 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729530 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D21B1/02 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
D21B1/02 (EP,FI,KR,US);
B02C4/30 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S100/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/36] | Title | German: | SEGMENTIERTE ROLLE ZUM QUETSCHEN VON HOLZSPÄNEN | [1996/36] | English: | SEGMENTED WOOD CHIP CRACKING ROLL | [1996/36] | French: | ROULEAU SEGMENTE DE FRAGMENTATION DE COPEAUX DE BOIS | [1996/36] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/36] | 13.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4953795 (BIELAGUS JOSEPH [US]); | [A]FR2674776 (BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) |