EP0730706 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE OPERATION OF AN AIR-SCAVENGED SUPERCHARGED HEAT ENGINE, AND HEAT ENGINE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.1998 [1998/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CURTIL, Rémi 43, rue Laugier 75017 Paris / FR | [1997/39] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states CURTIL, Rémi 8, rue Nicolas Chuquet F-75017 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/37] | Representative(s) | Michardière, Bernard Cabinet Armengaud Aîné 3, Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | Michardière, Bernard 7ter Boulevard Henri Ruel 94120 Fontenay-sous-Bois / FR | Application number, filing date | 95902153.6 | 18.11.1994 | [1996/37] | WO1994FR01348 | Priority number, date | FR19930013922 | 22.11.1993 Original published format: FR 9313922 | [1996/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514853 | Date: | 01.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0730706 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0730706 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02B29/08 | [1996/37] | CPC: |
F02D13/0273 (EP,US);
F02B29/08 (EP,KR,US);
F02D13/0246 (EP,US);
F01L1/08 (EP,US);
F02B2075/184 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESSEREN FUNKTION EINER AUFGELADENEN BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT LUFTSTRÖMUNG UND MOTORBAU ZUR REALISIERUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | [1996/37] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE OPERATION OF AN AIR-SCAVENGED SUPERCHARGED HEAT ENGINE, AND HEAT ENGINE THEREFOR | [1996/37] | French: | PROCEDE POUR AMELIORER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR THERMIQUE SURALIMENTE ET BALAYE AVEC DE L'AIR, ET MOTEUR THERMIQUE AGENCE POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE | [1997/35] |
Former [1996/37] | PROCEDE POUR AMELIORER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR THERMIQUE SURALIMENTE ET BALAYE AVEC DE L'AIR, ET MOTEUR THERMIQUE AGENCE POUR LA MISE EN UVRE DU PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 15.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2271393 (ALSACIENNE CONSTR MECA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 6 - page 4, line 27 * * figure - *; | [AD]FR2448032 (SEMT) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]CH435860 (WHITWORTH & CO [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1153612 (BURMEISTER & WAINS MOT MASK); | [A]FR1030063 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG); | [A]DE3940992 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP0201404 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) |