EP0733006 - PIEZOELECTRIC FLUID CONTROL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
ES
FR
SE
FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | For:DE
ES
FR
SE
RAYTHEON COMPANY 141 Spring Street Lexington Massachusetts 02173 / US | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | For:DE
ES
FR
SE
Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | ||
For:DE
ES
FR
SE
RAYTHEON COMPANY 141 Spring Street Lexington Massachusetts 02173 / US | |||
For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Shunso, Frank 30420 Lyndon, Livonia Wayne County, MI 48154 / US | 02 /
ECKERT, Steven, James 224 Mount Vernon Boulevard, Royal Oak Oakland County, MI 48073 / US | 03 /
ENGELMAN, Gerald, H. 3820 Syracuse, Dearborn Wayne County, MI 48124 / US | 04 /
DIONESOTES, Neil, Thomas 420 Great Road, No. B-10 Acton, MA 01720 / US | 05 /
COLLINS, Robert, Collins 105 Simonds Road Lexington, MA 02713 / US | 06 /
BERNSTEIN, Steven, David Apartment No. 6, 99 Perry Street Brookline, MA 02146 / US | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95902195.7 | 30.11.1994 | [1996/39] | WO1994GB02617 | Priority number, date | US19930163212 | 06.12.1993 Original published format: US 163212 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9515873 | Date: | 15.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0733006 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0733006 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/36, B60G17/015, F16H61/02, F02M59/46, F16K31/00, F15C5/00, H01L41/09 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
F16K31/005 (EP,US);
B60G17/01941 (EP,US);
B60T8/363 (EP,US);
B60T8/366 (EP,US);
B60T8/369 (EP,US);
F15C5/00 (EP,US);
F16H61/0251 (EP,US);
F16K99/0001 (EP,US);
F16K99/0007 (EP,US);
F16K99/0048 (EP,US);
F02M2200/502 (EP,US);
F16K2099/0074 (EP,US);
F16K2099/008 (EP,US);
F16K2099/0082 (EP,US);
F16K2099/009 (EP,US);
F16K99/0034 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0318 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86718 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1996/39] | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHES FLÜSSIGKEITSSTEUERVENTIL | [1996/39] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC FLUID CONTROL VALVE | [1996/39] | French: | SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE PIEZO-ELECTRIQUE POUR FLUIDE | [1996/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 30.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1226843 (ELLIOTT BROTHERS LONDON LTD); | [A]EP0160463 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]US4585209 (AINE HARRY E [US], et al); | [AD]US4690465 (TAKEDA KENJI [JP], et al); | [A]DE3608550 (FESTO KG [DE]); | [AD]US4768751 (GIACHINO JOSEPH M [US], et al); | [AD]US5217283 (WATANABE SHUNSO F [US]); | [PAD]US5309943 (STEVENSON PAUL E [US], et al); | [PAD]EP0619210 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) |