EP0683321 - SWINGING ROTARY COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Yasushi, Shiga-seisakusho of Daikin Industries, Ltd, 1000-2, Aza Ootani Okamoto-cho, Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525 / JP | [1995/47] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/47] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95902284.9 | 01.12.1994 | [1995/47] | WO1994JP02020 | Priority number, date | JP19930307924 | 08.12.1993 Original published format: JP 30792493 | [1995/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9516136 | Date: | 15.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683321 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683321 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.06.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/32, F04C29/02 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
F04C18/322 (EP);
F04C18/356 (KR);
F04C29/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/47] | F04C18/356 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/47] | Title | German: | SCHWINGENDER ROTATIONS-KOMPRESSOR | [1995/47] | English: | SWINGING ROTARY COMPRESSOR | [1995/47] | French: | COMPRESSEUR ROTATIF OSCILLANT | [1995/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1995 | Translation filed | 08.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1995 | Search fee paid | 08.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 31.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB729281 (VADIM STEPHANE MAKAROFF) [Y] 1,2 * page 2, line 2 - line 86; figures 6,7 *; | [Y]US3269646 (PAUL AUGUST) [Y] 1,2 * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 4; figures 5-7 *; | [A]FR937086 (BROUQUET) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]FR698476 (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 24 - line 65; figure - * * page 5, line 43 - line 56 * | International search | [A]JPS4216099B ; | [A]JPS48113011U ; | [A]JPH05202874 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JPH05248380 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JPH05306691 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JPH05312169 (DAIKIN IND LTD) |