EP0735999 - A METHOD OF CLEAVING ARYLETHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.1998 [1998/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1997/48] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center, Abbott Road Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYSENKO, Zenon 214 West Meadowbrook Drive Midland, MI 48640 / US | 02 /
PEWS, Richard, Garth 4403 Andre Street Midland, MI 48640 / US | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Fleischer, Holm Herbert polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Fleischer, Holm Herbert Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann, Dr. Hans-Günther Sternagel, Dr. Hans Dörries, Sander Aue 30 51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 95902595.8 | 15.11.1994 | [1996/41] | WO1994US13313 | Priority number, date | US19930173451 | 23.12.1993 Original published format: US 173451 | [1996/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9517372 | Date: | 29.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0735999 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C201/12, C07C213/02, C07C37/055, C07C205/23, C07C215/80 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
C07C201/12 (EP,US);
C07C213/02 (EP,US);
C07C213/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/12, C07C205/23 (US,EP);
C07C201/12, C07C205/37 (US,EP);
C07C201/12, C07C205/38 (EP,US);
C07C213/02, C07C215/80 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SPALTUNG VON ARYLETHERN | [1996/41] | English: | A METHOD OF CLEAVING ARYLETHERS | [1996/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE CLIVAGE DES ARYLETHERS | [1996/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 16.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/18] | 28.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS62263165 ; | [A]US3689580 (HALL DAVID W, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 7 - line 32; example III *; | JPH02229143 [ ] (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) | [A] - M. VIVEKANANDA BHATT, "Cleavage of ethers", SYNTHESIS, STUTTGART DE, (1889), pages 249 - 282 [A] 1,5,15 * page 251, column L, line 10 - page 252, column L * | [AD] - A. M. BERNARD ET AL., "Dealkylation of Activated Alkyl Aryl Ethers Using Lithium Chloride in Dimethylformamide", SYNTHESIS, STUTTGART DE, (1989), pages 287 - 289 [AD] 1,5 * the whole document * | [A] - K. KATO, K. KONDO, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910401), vol. 114, no. 13, Database accession no. 121720r, page 733 [A] 15 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 51, Database accession no. 87-359762, & JPS62263165 A 19871116 (NIHON NOYAKU) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |