EP0686973 - DATA REPRODUCING DEVICE AND DATA RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA, Makoto Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
FUJINAMI, Yasushi Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95902984.4 | 19.12.1994 | [1995/50] | WO1994JP02133 | Priority number, date | JP19930344012 | 18.12.1993 Original published format: JP 34401293 | [1995/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9516990 | Date: | 22.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686973 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686973 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.06.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B20/10, G11B20/18, H04N5/93, G11B27/32, G11B27/30 | [1997/25] | CPC: |
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
G11B20/12 (EP,KR,US);
G11B20/00007 (EP,US);
G11B20/00695 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B20/1251 (EP,US);
G11B20/1809 (EP,US);
G11B20/1816 (EP,US);
G11B20/1833 (EP,US);
G11B20/1866 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/3036 (EP,US);
G11B27/3063 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
H04N5/9206 (EP,US);
H04N5/9261 (EP,US);
H04N5/937 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1232 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1285 (EP,US);
G11B2220/213 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2537 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/65 (EP,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
H04N9/8063 (EP,US);
H04N9/8205 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/50] | G11B20/12, G11B20/10, G11B20/18, H04N5/93 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/50] | Title | German: | DATENWIEDERGABEVORRICHTUNG UND DATENAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [1995/50] | English: | DATA REPRODUCING DEVICE AND DATA RECORDING MEDIUM | [1995/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION DE DONNEES ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNEES | [1995/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.1995 | Translation filed | 11.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1995 | Search fee paid | 11.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 05.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06075403.3 / EP1667147 | EP99108322.1 / EP0940814 | EP99108324.7 / EP0949619 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0450745 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 3-5,24,25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0505985 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 3,4,39-41,52-54,58,61,62* the whole document *; | [A]EP0553816 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS5587260 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS55157116 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPS58198935 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPS6052964 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPS6089873 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPS6145474 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPS61208676 (RICOH KK); | [A]JPS61269208 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JPS6295773 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPS62119773 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS62154985 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [A]JPS62204434 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH0142068B ; | [A]JPH01236470 (NIPPON ELECTRIC ENG); | [A]JPH01282778 (RICOH KK); | [A]JPH0237572 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JPH02185766 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH03128586 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [A]JPH0428056 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH0447884 (AIWA CO); | [A]JPH04107084 (NIPPON DENKI HOME ELECTRONICS); | [A]JPH0520798 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH0528648 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH0568226 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [A]JPH05159473 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH05225694 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH05236409 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH05234253 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH05252055 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]JPH05258533 ; | [A]JPH05258028 ; | [A]JPH05290551 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH05325515 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPH05328289 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | [A] - Edited by HIROSHI YASUDA, "National Standard of Multimedia Coding", June 30, 1991 (30.06.91), Maruzen, p. 204-254. |