EP0734222 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR NON-INVASIVE DETERMINATION OF GLUCOSE CONCENTRATION IN PARTS OF THE HUMAN BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2002 | Change - refusal | published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHO, Ok-Kyung Feldblumenweg 3 D-44267 Dortmund / DE | [1996/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Ok-Kyung Feldblumenweg 3 44267 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
HOLZGREVE, Birgit Chemnitzer Strasse 60 44139 Dortmund / DE | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Münich, Wilhelm Dr. Münich & Kollegen Anwaltskanzlei Wilhelm-Mayr-Strasse 11 80689 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Münich, Wilhelm, Dr. Kanzlei Münich, Rösler, Steinmann Wilhelm-Mayr-Str. 11 80689 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95903231.9 | 12.12.1994 | [1996/40] | WO1994DE01475 | Priority number, date | DE19934342105 | 12.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4342105 | [1996/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9515711 | Date: | 15.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0734222 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/015 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR NONINVASIVEN BESTIMMUNG DER GLUCOSEKONZENTRATION IN TEILEN DES MENSCHLICHEN KÖRPERS | [1996/40] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR NON-INVASIVE DETERMINATION OF GLUCOSE CONCENTRATION IN PARTS OF THE HUMAN BODY | [1996/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETERMINATION NON INVASIVE DE LA CONCENTRATION DE GLUCOSE DANS DES PARTIES DU CORPS HUMAIN | [1996/40] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 13.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/35] | 15.12.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2001/28] | 09.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/35] | 09.02.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.02.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0420177 (ARGUMENS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10,14,16,22,24 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 10; claim - *; | [A]DE2105820 (OSBORNE W, et al) [A] 1,9-11,36 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 15 * * page 5, line 21 - page 8, line 12; figure - *; | [A]DE2518141 (TIETZ ERICH [DE]) [A] 15 * claim - * | [A] - R. M. HILLSON ET AL., "FACIAL AND SUBLINGUAL TEMPERATURE CHANGES FOLLOWING INTRAVENOUS GLUCOSE INJECTION IN DIABETICS", DIABETE & METABOLISME, PARIS (FR), vol. 8, pages 15 - 19 [A] 1,2,10 * page 16, column L, line 5 - line 36 * |