EP0737117 - METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE INTEGRAL CASTING OF METAL STRIP CLOSE TO ITS FINAL DIMENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [1996/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URLAU, Ulrich Krefelder Weg 226 D-47447 Moers / DE | 02 /
SCHLECHTRIEM, Helmut Maiblumenstrasse 9a D-47229 Duisburg / DE | 03 /
REICHELT, Wolfgang Am Bendmannsfeld 52 D-47447 Moers / DE | 04 /
FEUERSTACKE, Ewald Sperberstrasse 2 D-45282 Dorsten / DE | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/42] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 95903251.7 | 14.12.1994 | [1996/42] | WO1994DE01519 | Priority number, date | DE19934344953 | 27.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4344953 | [1996/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9517987 | Date: | 06.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737117 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737117 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06, B22D11/10 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
B22D41/14 (EP,US);
B22D11/0631 (EP,US);
B22D11/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANGIESSEN EINES ENDABMESSUNGSNAHEN METALLBANDES | [1996/42] | English: | METHOD AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE INTEGRAL CASTING OF METAL STRIP CLOSE TO ITS FINAL DIMENSIONS | [1996/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA COULEE D'UN FEUILLARD METALLIQUE AU VOISINAGE DE SES DIMENSIONS DEFINITIVES | [1996/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.05.1998 | CH | 31.12.1998 | LI | 31.12.1998 | [2008/06] |
Former [2000/52] | IT | 20.05.1998 | |
CH | 31.12.1998 | ||
LI | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 20.05.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3440237 (MANNESMANN AG [DE])[A] 1,2,4; | [A]DE3521778 (SUNDWIGER EISEN MASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 1,3,8; | [A]DE3810302 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4; | [A]DE4039959 (WIELAND-WERKE) [A] 1,2,4; | [X]EP0534174 (WIELAND WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 |