EP0741839 - MICRO-DIAPHRAGM PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Weberstrasse 5 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [1997/48] |
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states Kernforschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Weberstrasse 5 D-76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜSTGENS, Burkhard Bienwaldstrasse 15 D-76178 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
STERN, Gerhard Grötzinger Strasse 30 D-76327 Pfinztal / DE | 03 /
KELLER, Wolfgang Buchenweg 10 D-76707 Hambrücken / DE | 04 /
SEIDEL, Dieter Württembergerstrasse 1 D-76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | 05 /
MAAS, Dieter Augustastrasse 44 D-68723 Oftersheim / DE | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Rückert, Friedrich Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Stabsabteilung Innovation Postfach 36 40 76021 Karlsruhe / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [2009/27] | Rückert, Friedrich Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Weberstrasse 5 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1996/46] | Rückert, Friedrich, Dr. Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Weberstrasse 5 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 95903302.8 | 29.11.1994 | [1996/46] | WO1994EP03954 | Priority number, date | DE19944402119 | 25.01.1994 Original published format: DE 4402119 | [1996/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520105 | Date: | 27.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741839 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741839 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/06, F04B43/04, // F16K7/17 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
F04B43/043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DK, FR, IT, LI, NL [1996/46] | Title | German: | MIKROMEMBRANPUMPE | [1996/46] | English: | MICRO-DIAPHRAGM PUMP | [1996/46] | French: | MICROPOMPE A MEMBRANE | [1996/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.1996 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 10.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3606592 (MADURSKI JOSEPH P, et al) [Y] 1-3; | [Y]GB2088965 (VARI GYULA) [Y] 1-3; | [A]SE440122 (ELOMATIC OY [FI])[A] 1-3; | [Y]NO173755B (WESTONBRIDGE INT LTD [IE]) [Y] 1-3 |