EP0736111 - METALLIC SCREEN MATERIAL HAVING A STRAND OR FIBRE STRUCTURE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STORK SCREENS B.V. Raamstraat 3 5831 AT Boxmeer / NL | [1999/16] |
Former [1996/41] | For all designated states STORK SCREENS B.V. Raamstraat 3 NL-5831 AT Boxmeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNAKENBORG, Johannes Tonnis Breukinklaan 19 NL-6591 NC Dieren / NL | 02 /
KORSSE, Johannes Kloversdonk 202 NL-7326 AS Apeldoorn / NL | [1996/41] | Representative(s) | Barendregt, Frank Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Barendregt, Frank, Drs. van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 95903460.4 | 16.12.1994 | [1996/41] | WO1994NL00321 | Priority number, date | NL19930002238 | 22.12.1993 Original published format: NL 9302238 | [1996/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9517534 | Date: | 29.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0736111 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0736111 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C25D1/08, B41C1/14 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
B41N1/247 (EP,US);
C25D1/08 (EP,US);
Y10S428/935 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T442/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/41] | Title | German: | METALLISCHES SIEBMATERIAL MIT STRANG- ODER FASERSTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1996/41] | English: | METALLIC SCREEN MATERIAL HAVING A STRAND OR FIBRE STRUCTURE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A MATERIAL | [1996/41] | French: | MATERIAU A MAILLES METALLIQUES A STRUCTURE COMPOSEE DE FILS OU DE FIBRES, ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1996/41] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/41] | 09.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.04.1999 | BE | 21.04.1999 | ES | 21.04.1999 | GR | 21.04.1999 | SE | 21.04.1999 | DK | 21.07.1999 | PT | 23.07.1999 | IE | 16.12.1999 | LU | 16.12.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
ES | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
DK | 21.07.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 16.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
ES | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 16.12.1999 | ||
MC | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
ES | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 16.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 16.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 16.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 16.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 21.04.1999 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3759799 (REINKE G); | [Y]FR2225542 (CHAMPION SPARK PLUG CO [US]); | [A]US4039396 (ANSELRODE LODEWIJK); | [A]DE2728084 (STORK BRABANT BV); | [Y]GB2051620 (TOSHIN KOGYO CO); | [DY]EP0038104 (STORK SCREENS BV [NL]); | [Y]EP0492731 (STORK SCREENS BV [NL]) | by applicant | US4039396 | EP0038104 | EP0492731 |