EP0686399 - POWDERY PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATION AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAN-EI SUCROCHEMICAL CO. LTD. 24-5, Kitahama-machi Chita-shi Aichi 478 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states SAN-EI SUCROCHEMICAL CO. LTD. 24-5, Kitahama-machi Chita-shi, Aichi 478 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Takanori 1303, Naruoka 2-chome Midori-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 458 / JP | 02 /
HASEGAWA, Nobuhiro 114, Aza-Kosogawaki Oh-aza-usaka Agui-cho Chita-gun Aichi 470-22 / JP | 03 /
KATSURO, Masaaki 5-44, Shougetsu-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Kazumasa 1327, Fukaya Ayase-shi Kanagawa 252 / JP | 05 /
KOISHI, Masumi A-10, Kyoin-jutaku Science Univ. Tokyo 107-6, Tomino Oshamanbe-cho Yamakoshi-gun Hokkaido 049-35 / JP | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Pernez, Helga NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Pernez, Helga Breese-Majerowicz, 3, avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/50] | Pernez, Helga Breese - Majerowicz, CNIT - WTC 2 - P.B. 434 F-92053 Paris la Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 95903984.3 | 27.12.1994 | [1995/50] | WO1994JP02246 | Priority number, date | JP19930346829 | 27.12.1993 Original published format: JP 34682993 | [1995/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9517909 | Date: | 06.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686399 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.07.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/36, C08B30/12, C12P19/14, C08L3/02, A61K9/50 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K9/146 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/50] | A61K47/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/50] | Title | German: | PULVERFÖRMIGE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNG UND IHR HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1995/50] | English: | POWDERY PHARMACEUTICAL PREPARATION AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME | [1995/50] | French: | PREPARATION PHARMACEUTIQUE PULVERULENTE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1995/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1995 | Translation filed | 20.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.1995 | Search fee paid | 20.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/10] | 27.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/44] | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8904842 (WHISTLER ROY L [US]) [X] 1-4,6-11 * page 2, line 16 - line 29 * * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 5 * * claim 7 *; | [A]EP0522929 (BOURGOGNE BIODYNE [FR]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 51 - line 54 * * page 3, line 6 - line 13 *; | [DA]JPH05112469 ; | [A]JPH01106817 ; | [A]EP0182296 (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 23, no. 93, Database accession no. 93-185172, & JPH05112469 A 19930507 (SANEI TOKA KK) [DA] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 22, Database accession no. 89-162872, & JPH01106817 A 19890424 (KITTY KK) [A] 1,5,15 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS5225015 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) |