EP0730596 - BENZODIAZEPINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDWIN, John, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
CLAREMON, David, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 03 /
ELLIOTT, Jason, M. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 04 /
LIVERTON, Nigel 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 05 /
REMY, David, C. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 06 /
SELNICK, Harold, G. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [1996/37] | Representative(s) | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | Hiscock, Ian James, et al European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 95904124.5 | 21.11.1994 | [1996/37] | WO1994US13546 | Priority number, date | US19930155669 | 22.11.1993 Original published format: US 155669 | [1996/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514694 | Date: | 01.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0730596 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.06.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D498/04, C07D513/04, A61K31/55 | [1996/37] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/37] | Title | German: | BENZODIAZEPINE | [1996/37] | English: | BENZODIAZEPINES | [1996/37] | French: | BENZODIAZEPINES | [1996/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.1996 | Search fee paid | 24.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/11] | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9307129 (YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [X] 1-6* page 98; examples 504,540; claim - * | International search | [XA]US4663321 (BOCK MARK G [US], et al); | [XA]EP0514125 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [XA]WO9407129 (KRANBUEHL DAVID E [US]) | [XA] - J. MED. CHEM., Volume 31, issued January 1988, M.G. BOCK et al., "Cholecystokinin Antagonists. Synthesis and Biological Evaluation of 4-Substituted 4H-(1,2,4) Triazolo (4,3-a)(1,4) Benzodiazepines", pages 176-181. |