EP0706374 - METHOD FOR PREPARING LIPOSOMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 460 Point San Bruno Boulevard South San Francisco CA 94080 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states GENENTECH, INC. 460 Point San Bruno Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Chung, C. 13120 Delson Court Los Altos Hills, CA 94022 / US | [1996/16] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95904347.2 | 29.06.1994 | [1996/16] | WO1994US07327 | Priority number, date | US19930084933 | 30.06.1993 Original published format: US 84933 | [1996/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9501164 | Date: | 12.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706374 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0706374 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127 | [1996/16] | CPC: |
A61K9/1277 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/50] |
Former [1996/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LIPOSOMEN | [1997/50] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING LIPOSOMES | [1996/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE LIPOSOMES | [1996/16] |
Former [1996/16] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Liposomen | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 03.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO8601714 (RIKER LABORATORIES INC [US]) [Y] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9013285 (ENZYTECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-19 * page 7 - page 8; example 1 * | Examination | - WO-A-86/01714 | - WO-A-90/13285 |