EP0737062 - WATER-IN-OIL LOTION CONTAINING A CORTICOSTEROID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GALDERMA S.A. Sinserstrasse 47, B.P. 80 CH-6330 Cham / CH | [1996/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATTLER, Henning Jahnring 15 D-22297 Hamburg / DE | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Tezier Herman, Béatrice, et al L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Tezier Herman, Béatrice, et al L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1997/45] | Tezier Herman, Béatrice, et al L'OREAL, 90, rue du Géneral Roguet 92583 Clichy Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1996/42] | Tetaz, Franck, et al L'OREAL, 90, rue du Général Roguet 92583 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95904527.9 | 22.12.1994 | [1996/42] | WO1994EP04288 | Priority number, date | DE19934344697 | 27.12.1993 Original published format: DE 4344697 | [1996/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9517883 | Date: | 06.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737062 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0737062 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/107, A61K47/00 | [1996/42] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/08 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/42] | Title | German: | WASSER-IN-OEL-LOTION, DIE EIN CORTICOSTEROID ENTHAELT | [1998/18] | English: | WATER-IN-OIL LOTION CONTAINING A CORTICOSTEROID | [1996/42] | French: | LOTION EAU DANS HUILE CONTENANT DU CORTICOSTEROIDE | [1996/42] |
Former [1996/42] | CORTICOSTEROID-ENTHALTENDE WASSER-IN-OEL-LOTION | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 18.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.1998 | ES | 06.05.1998 | GR | 06.05.1998 | NL | 06.05.1998 | DK | 06.08.1998 | PT | 06.08.1998 | SE | 06.08.1998 | IE | 11.12.1998 | LU | 22.12.1998 | BE | 31.12.1998 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
ES | 06.05.1998 | ||
GR | 06.05.1998 | ||
NL | 06.05.1998 | ||
DK | 06.08.1998 | ||
PT | 06.08.1998 | ||
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
ES | 06.05.1998 | ||
GR | 06.05.1998 | ||
NL | 06.05.1998 | ||
PT | 06.08.1998 | ||
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
ES | 06.05.1998 | ||
GR | 06.05.1998 | ||
PT | 06.08.1998 | ||
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
GR | 06.05.1998 | ||
PT | 06.08.1998 | ||
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
IE | 11.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
GR | 06.05.1998 | ||
IE | 06.05.1998 | ||
PT | 06.08.1998 | ||
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
BE | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
IE | 06.05.1998 | ||
PT | 06.08.1998 | ||
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
BE | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
IE | 06.05.1998 | ||
PT | 06.08.1998 | ||
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
IE | 06.05.1998 | ||
PT | 06.08.1998 | ||
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
IE | 06.05.1998 | ||
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
SE | 06.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | SE | 06.08.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS58162516 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 46, no. 89, Database accession no. 83-805363, & JPS58162516 A 19891023 (FUJISAWA PHARM.) [A] * abstract * | [A] - K.L. WATSKY ET AL., "Water-in-oil emollients as steroid-sparing adjunctive therapy in the treatment of psoriasis.", CUTIS, vol. 50, no. 5, pages 383 - 386 |