EP0687394 - IMPROVED PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING ALTERNATOR POLE PIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1999 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ateliers Thome-Genot Boîte postale 17 08700 Nouzonville / FR | [1998/47] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states Ateliers Thome-Genot Boîte postale 17 F-08700 Nouzonville / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOFFART, André, Eugène 31, rue de la Chappe F-08700 Nouzonville / FR | [1995/51] | Representative(s) | Dixon, Donald Cossar, et al Wilson Gunn Gee Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | Dixon, Donald Cossar, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95904676.4 | 29.12.1994 | [1995/51] | WO1995IB00030 | Priority number, date | US19940176655 | 03.01.1994 Original published format: US 176655 | [1995/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9519062 | Date: | 13.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687394 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687394 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/02, B23P15/00, B21K1/74, C21D8/00 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
B23P15/00 (EP,US);
B21K1/28 (EP,US);
C21D8/00 (EP,US);
H02K15/022 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/51] | Extension states | LT | 27.07.1995 | SI | 27.07.1995 | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLSTÜCKEN FÜR WECHSELSTROMGENERATOR | [1995/51] | English: | IMPROVED PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING ALTERNATOR POLE PIECE | [1995/51] | French: | PROCEDE PERFECTIONNE DE FABRICATION D'UN ELEMENT POLAIRE POUR ALTERNATEUR | [1995/51] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 16.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 18.11.1998 | [2008/24] | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH03164052 ; | [A]JPS5623337 ; | [A]JPH02301579 ; | [A]US3780413 (BURGDORF M) [A] 4,21 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1571276 (AIDA ENG LTD) [A] 1,21 * the whole document *; | [YA]US4558511 (KATO MASA [JP]) [Y] 18,20 * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 7; figure - * [A] 19; | [A]EP0213981 (DUCELLIER & CIE [FR]) [A] 16* column 2, line 23 - line 26; figure 4 *; | [YA]US5016340 (KATO MASA [JP]) [Y] 12,13 * column 4, line 12 - column 6, line 30; figure - * [A] 1-3,8,16,18,21; | [A]US5137586 (KLINK JAMES H [US]) [A] 10,11,14 * claims 10,14 *; | [A]EP0515259 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [A] 15,18 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911011), vol. 015, no. 401, Database accession no. (E - 1121), & JP03164052 A 19910716 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 12,13,18,20 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810514), vol. 005, no. 072, Database accession no. (M - 068), & JP56023337 A 19810305 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910221), vol. 015, no. 076, Database accession no. (C - 0809), & JP02301579 A 19901213 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] 8,9,16,17 * abstract * |