EP0733209 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR DETECTION OF ANALYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOSYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 500 Mount Everest Way Alpharetta, GA 30202 / US | [1996/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENNEDY, Stephen, J. 500 Mount Everest Way Alpharetta, GA 30202 / US | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/39] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95904843.0 | 06.12.1994 | [1996/39] | WO1994US14094 | Priority number, date | US19930162870 | 06.12.1993 Original published format: US 162870 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9516206 | Date: | 15.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0733209 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
G01N33/5438 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/39] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON ANALYTEN | [1996/39] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR DETECTION OF ANALYTES | [1996/39] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE SERVANT A DETECTER DES ANALYTES | [1996/39] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.1996 | Search fee paid | 05.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 26.03.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.1997 | 31.12.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]USH201H | [X] - ROITT, "Essential Immunology", Published 1991 by BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS , (OXFORD, ENGLAND), pp. 56, 57, 117118. | [X] - SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, Vol. 7, issued 1992, KLEE et al., "A Biosensor Based on the Membrane Protein Lactose Permease"pp. 376-379. | [X] - ANALYTICAL CHIMICA ACTA, Vol. 281, issued 24 September 1993, ADACHI et al., "NA+,K+-ATPase-Based Bilayer Lipid Membrane Sensor for Adenosine 5'-Triphosphate"pages 577-584. |