EP0690813 - WRAP-AROUND CARRIER WITH PARTIAL END PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIVERWOOD INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 3350 Cumberland Circle, Suite 1600 Atlanta Georgia 30339 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states RIVERWOOD INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 3350 Cumberland Circle, Suite 1600 Atlanta, Georgia 30339 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTHERLAND, Robert, L. 4929 Pembridge Lane Kennesaw, GA 30144 / US | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Grättinger & Partner Postfach 16 55 D-82306 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95904933.9 | 19.12.1994 | [1996/02] | WO1994US14582 | Priority number, date | US19940191226 | 03.02.1994 Original published format: US 191226 | [1996/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9521103 | Date: | 10.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690813 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.08.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/12 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
B65D71/36 (EP,US);
B65B21/00 (KR);
B65D71/00 (KR);
B65D2571/0016 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00185 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00277 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0029 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00444 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00543 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/02] | Title | German: | UMHÜLLENDER VERPACKUNGSTRÄGER MIT TEILSEITENWÄNDEN | [1996/02] | English: | WRAP-AROUND CARRIER WITH PARTIAL END PANELS | [1996/02] | French: | EMBALLAGE ENVELOPPANT A PANNEAUX TERMINAUX PARTIELS | [1996/02] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.1995 | Search fee paid | 26.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 05.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/52] | 01.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3156377 (WYSOCKI LAWRENCE S) [A] 2,11 * column 3, line 16 - line 21; figure 1 * | International search | [XY]US4925019 (GANZ ROBERT H [US], et al); | [XY]US3294280 (GRASER EARL J); | [XY]US3181727 (GRASER EARL J, et al); | [A]US4901849 (WILSON JERRY F [US]); | [A]US4597523 (SCHUSTER RICHARD L [US]); | [A]US4437606 (GRASER EARL J [US]); | [A]US3398856 (GRASER EARL J); | [A]US3270914 (GRASER EARL J); | [A]US3128010 (FORRER HOMER W) |