EP0741831 - HORIZONTALLY SLIDING WINDOW WITH AT LEAST ONE WING WHICH CAN MOVE PERPENDICULARLY TO THE PLANE OF THE WINDOW FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GÖTZ Entwicklung + Lizenz GmbH Grosswalding 3 D-94469 Deggendorf / DE | [1996/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUGUSTIN, Christian Ritzmais 12 94253 Bischofsmais / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Roland Mühlbogenstrasse 72a 94469 Deggendorf / DE | 03 /
ROTHKAMM, Horst Hilzstrasse 78 94469 Deggendorf / DE | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Zahn, Roland Berghausener Strasse 10 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing. Im Speitel 102 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 95905031.1 | 04.01.1995 | [1996/46] | WO1995DE00003 | Priority number, date | DE19944402464 | 28.01.1994 Original published format: DE 4402464 | [1996/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520712 | Date: | 03.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741831 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741831 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/46, E05D15/06 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
E05D15/1042 (EP);
E06B3/4627 (EP);
E05D2015/1055 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/46] | Title | German: | HORIZONTALSCHIEBEFENSTER MIT MINDESTENS EINEM QUER ZUR RAHMENEBENE BEWEGBAREN SCHIEBEFLÜGEL | [1996/46] | English: | HORIZONTALLY SLIDING WINDOW WITH AT LEAST ONE WING WHICH CAN MOVE PERPENDICULARLY TO THE PLANE OF THE WINDOW FRAME | [1996/46] | French: | FENETRE COULISSANT HORIZONTALEMENT A AU MOINS UN BATTANT COULISSANT DEPLA ABLE PERPENDICULAIREMENT AU PLAN DU CHASSIS | [1996/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 14.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 05.08.1998 | GR | 05.08.1998 | [2002/26] |
Former [2001/23] | GR | 05.08.1998 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3660936 (BRYSON DAVID W) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 22; figure - * [Y] 3,4,6; | [A]FR2249231 (WIELAND WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 2-4 * page 4, line 18 - line 28; figure 6 *; | [Y]GB1444034 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK) [Y] 6 * page 1, line 61 - line 77; figure 4 *; | [A]FR2456821 (KLEIN ANDRE) [A] 2-4* page 1, paragraph 3 *; | [A]FR2644835 (GISELBRECHT YVES [FR]) [A] 2-7 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0565492 (METRA METALL TRAFILATI ALLUMIN [IT]) [Y] 3,4 * column 3, line 18 - line 29; figures 1,2,12 * [A] 2 |