EP0740607 - DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLING, DISMANTLING AND TRANSPORTING EASILY BENT, ARC-SHAPED OBJECTS WITH FOLDED SUSPENSION EDGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.1999 [1999/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [1998/50] |
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states KOENIG & BAUER-ALBERT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÜRR, Reinhold Rudolf Riedstrasse 31 D-97076 Würzburg / DE | 02 /
MUTH, Bernhard Walter Wolfgang Speckertsweg 25 D-97209 Veitshöchheim / DE | [1996/45] | Application number, filing date | 95905545.0 | 17.01.1995 | [1996/45] | WO1995DE00046 | Priority number, date | DE19944401110 | 17.01.1994 Original published format: DE 4401110 | DE19944424931 | 14.07.1994 Original published format: DE 4424931 | [1996/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9519262 | Date: | 20.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740607 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740607 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
B41F27/1206 (EP,US);
B41P2227/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1996/45] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MONTAGE, DEMONTAGE UND TRANSPORT VON LEICHT BIEGBAREN, BOGENFÖRMIGEN GEGENSTÄNDEN MIT EINHÄNGEABKANTUNGEN | [1996/45] | English: | DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLING, DISMANTLING AND TRANSPORTING EASILY BENT, ARC-SHAPED OBJECTS WITH FOLDED SUSPENSION EDGES | [1996/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE MONTAGE, LE DEMONTAGE ET LE TRANSPORT D'OBJETS COURBES FACILEMENT PLIABLES POURVUS D'ARETES D'ACCROCHAGE | [1996/45] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 12.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE2804970 (SISENCA SA) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4727807 (SUZUKI KUNIO [JP], et al) [DA] 1* column W * |