EP0698278 - INDUCTIVE DEVICE COMPRISING CONNECTION MEMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE JONG, Erik, Adrianus, Andreas Zevenheuvelenweg 25 NL-5048 AN Tilburg / NL | 02 /
HOPMANS, Jan, Henricus, Maria Zevenheuvelenweg 25 NL-5048 AN Tilburg / NL | [1996/09] | Representative(s) | Stolk, Steven Adolph Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/23] | Stolk, Steven Adolph INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/09] | Veenstra, Gustaaf INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 95905740.7 | 31.01.1995 | [1996/09] | WO1995IB00064 | Priority number, date | EP19940200393 | 15.02.1994 Original published format: EP 94200393 | [1996/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9522154 | Date: | 17.08.1995 | [1995/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0698278 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0698278 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/29 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
H01F5/04 (EP,US);
H01F2005/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/09] | Title | German: | INDUKTIVE VORRICHTUNG MIT VERBINDUNGSELEMENTEN | [1996/09] | English: | INDUCTIVE DEVICE COMPRISING CONNECTION MEMBERS | [1996/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF INDUCTIF COMPRENANT DES ELEMENTS DE CONNEXION | [1996/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 31.01.1999 | [2000/03] | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1276914 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |