EP0698310 - HIGH FREQUENCY AC/AC CONVERTER WITH POWER FACTOR CORRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Rui c/o Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
GU, Wen-Jian c/o Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6, 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1999/18] |
Former [1996/31] | 01 /
LIU, Rui c/o Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
GU, Wen-Jian c/o Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1996/09] | 01 /
LIU, Rui 26 Scenic Drive Croton-on-Hudson, NY 10520 / US | ||
02 /
GU, Wen-Jian Baltic Place Croton-on-Hudson, NY 10520 / US | Representative(s) | Dusseldorp, Jan Charles Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | Dusseldorp, Jan Charles INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 95905748.0 | 02.02.1995 | [1996/09] | WO1995IB00073 | Priority number, date | US19940197530 | 10.02.1994 Original published format: US 197530 | [1996/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9522194 | Date: | 17.08.1995 | [1995/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0698310 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0698310 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/458, H05B41/29, H02M7/217 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
H02M1/4241 (EP,US);
H02M5/458 (EP,KR,US);
H05B41/28 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/09] | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENTER WECHSELSTROMWANDLER MIT LEISTUNGSFAKTORKORREKTUR | [1996/09] | English: | HIGH FREQUENCY AC/AC CONVERTER WITH POWER FACTOR CORRECTION | [1996/09] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR HAUTE FREQUENCE C.A./C.A. A CORRECTION DE FACTEUR DE PUISSANCE | [1996/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/16] | 14.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4564897 (OKAMOTO FUTOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5063490 (MAEHARA MINORU [JP], et al); | [A]US5182702 (HIRAMATSU AKINORI [JP], et al) |