EP0732888 - Refrigerated display case with lighting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/39] | DISPLAY CASE WITH LENS LIGHTING SYSTEM | ||
[2002/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anthony, Inc. 12812 Arroyo Street San Fernando, California 91342 / US | [1999/42] |
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states ANTHONY'S MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC. 12812 Arroyo Street San Fernando, CA 91342 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTOSUOSSO, Joseph, R. 11229 Sierra Pass Place Chatsworth, CA 91311 / US | 02 /
DOWNING, Bennie, Reed 300 Poplar Crest Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 03 /
CALDERON, Fernando 14160 Pinney Street Arleta, CA 91311 / US | 04 /
SEVERLOH, Paul 2692 Terrebonne Avenue San Dimas, CA 91773 / US | 05 /
CALDERON, Raymundo 14366 Beaver Street Sylmar, CA 91342 / US | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Wake, Steven John, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Wake, Steven John, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/39] | Hallam, Arnold Vincent, et al E.N. LEWIS & TAYLOR 5 The Quadrant Coventry, CV1 2EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95905863.7 | 06.12.1994 | [1996/39] | WO1994US14036 | Priority number, date | US19930163276 | 06.12.1993 Original published format: US 163276 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9516375 | Date: | 22.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0732888 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732888 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.06.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A47F11/10 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
F21V33/0012 (EP,US);
A47F11/10 (EP,US);
A47F3/001 (EP,US);
F21S8/037 (EP,US);
F21V17/04 (EP,US);
F21V17/164 (EP,US);
F21V5/04 (EP,US);
F21W2131/305 (EP,US);
F21W2131/405 (EP,US);
F21Y2103/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/39] | Title | German: | Kühlvitrine mit Beleuchtungssystem | [2002/24] | English: | Refrigerated display case with lighting system | [2002/24] | French: | Vitrine frigorifique avec système d'éclairage | [2002/24] |
Former [1996/39] | SCHAUSCHRANK UND EIN MIT LINSEN AUSGERÜSTETES LICHTSYSTEM DAFÜR | ||
Former [1996/39] | DISPLAY CASE WITH LENS LIGHTING SYSTEM | ||
Former [1996/39] | MEUBLE D'ETALAGE POUR DENREES ALIMENTAIRES REFRIGEREES AVEC SYSTEME D'ECLAIRAGE A LENTILLE | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1996 | Search fee paid | 02.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 02.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/39] | 08.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Request for further processing for: | 15.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 16.03.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.04.2003 | CH | 16.04.2003 | FR | 16.04.2003 | LI | 16.04.2003 | GR | 16.07.2003 | PT | 16.07.2003 | SE | 16.07.2003 | AT | 06.12.2003 | GB | 06.12.2003 | LU | 06.12.2003 | IE | 08.12.2003 | ES | 09.12.2003 | MC | 31.12.2003 | DK | 02.01.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/27] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
CH | 16.04.2003 | ||
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
SE | 16.07.2003 | ||
AT | 06.12.2003 | ||
GB | 06.12.2003 | ||
LU | 06.12.2003 | ||
IE | 08.12.2003 | ||
ES | 09.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
DK | 02.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
CH | 16.04.2003 | ||
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
SE | 16.07.2003 | ||
AT | 06.12.2003 | ||
GB | 06.12.2003 | ||
LU | 06.12.2003 | ||
IE | 08.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
DK | 02.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
CH | 16.04.2003 | ||
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
SE | 16.07.2003 | ||
AT | 06.12.2003 | ||
GB | 06.12.2003 | ||
IE | 08.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
DK | 02.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
CH | 16.04.2003 | ||
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
SE | 16.07.2003 | ||
GB | 06.12.2003 | ||
IE | 08.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
DK | 02.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
CH | 16.04.2003 | ||
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
SE | 16.07.2003 | ||
GB | 06.12.2003 | ||
IE | 08.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
CH | 16.04.2003 | ||
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
SE | 16.07.2003 | ||
GB | 06.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
CH | 16.04.2003 | ||
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
SE | 16.07.2003 | ||
GB | 06.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | BE | 16.04.2003 | |
CH | 16.04.2003 | ||
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
SE | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 16.04.2003 | |
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
GR | 16.07.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
SE | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 16.04.2003 | |
LI | 16.04.2003 | ||
PT | 16.07.2003 | ||
SE | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 16.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR627376 (HOLOPHANE SA) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 27,30-33,47-56; | [A]DE8533752U (WERBEFORM GMBH DISPLAYWERK) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 18 - page 7, line 4 *; | [A]EP0198088 (NEGISHI MASATAKA) [A] 1,16,27,32,33 * column A; figure - *; | [A]DE3541573 (WEIS ROLAND) [A] 1-6,16,32,34 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 40; figure - *; | [A]FR2654602 (COUTHIER PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1,3-7,32,34* page 3, line 30 - page 5, line 20; figure - *; | [X]GB2248676 (R B R LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,11-18,23,25 * page 4, line 21 - page 8, line 5; figure - * | International search | [A]US4979078 (AMSTUTZ DOUGLAS D [US], et al); | [A]US5016146 (KASPAR MELVIN [US]); | [A]US5034861 (SKLENAK JOHN S [US], et al) | Examination | DE2548268 | DE3305869 | WO9320733 |