EP0686183 - FUEL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING POLYALKYL AND POLY(OXYALKYLENE) AROMATIC ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron Chemical Company LLC 575 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94105 / US | [1998/30] |
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states CHEVRON CHEMICAL COMPANY 555 Market Street, Post Office Box 7141 San Francisco, California 94120-7141 / US | ||
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states CHEVRON CHEMICAL COMPANY 555 Market Street, Post Office Box 7141 San Francisco, CA 94120-7141 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERPECK, Richard, E. 8962 Cypress Avenue Cotati, CA 94931 / US | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | ||
Former [1995/50] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake & Co. 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95906056.7 | 21.12.1994 | [1995/50] | WO1994US14730 | Priority number, date | US19930173802 | 23.12.1993 Original published format: US 173802 | [1995/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9517485 | Date: | 29.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686183 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686183 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.06.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/24, C10L1/22, C10L1/18, C07F9/02, C08G65/32, C08F8/00, C07C69/80, C07C63/15, C07C233/64, C07C317/44, C07C323/62 | [1996/20] | CPC: |
C10L1/2475 (EP,US);
C07C233/65 (EP,US);
C07C233/78 (EP,US);
C07C255/56 (EP,US);
C07C317/44 (EP,US);
C07C323/62 (EP,US);
C07C69/82 (EP,US);
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
C08G65/3326 (EP,US);
C10L1/143 (EP,US);
C10L1/198 (EP,US);
C10L1/2364 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/34, C08F8/00, C08F110/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/50] | C10L1/24, C10L1/22, C10L1/18, C07F9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/50] | Title | German: | POLYALKYL-UND POLY(OXYALKYLEN)AROMATISCHE ESTER ENTHALTENDE BRENNSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1995/50] | English: | FUEL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING POLYALKYL AND POLY(OXYALKYLENE) AROMATIC ESTERS | [1995/50] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR CARBURANTS CONTENANT DES ETHERS AROMATIQUES POLYALKYLE ET POLY(OXYALKYLENE) | [1995/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.1995 | Search fee paid | 19.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Request for further processing for: | 07.06.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.06.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1317217 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) [X] 1-7,21-24 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2231706 (AGFA GEVAERT [BE]) [X] 1-9,14-17,21-24* claims 1-3 *; | [X]US4098708 (STUEBE CARL WALTER) [X] 1-10,12,14,17-19,21-24 * column 2, line 27 - line 42 * * column 1, line 39 - line 49 * * column 3 *; | [X]EP0277345 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-9,12-17,21-24 * page 5; claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO9116297 (EXXON CHEMICAL LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-10,12,14,17-19,21-24 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]US5069684 (BLAIN DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12,14-20 * column 3 - column 4 *; | [X]EP0555006 (SLOVNAFT AS [CS]) [X] 1-9,12,14-19,21-24 * page 5, line 46 - line 50; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US3288842 (VERDOL JOSEPH A); | [A]US3457286 (DEXTER MARTIN, et al); | [XY]US4349688 (SANDLER STANLEY R); | [Y]US5024678 (MERTENS-GOTTSELIG DAGMAR [DE], et al); | [PY]US5366519 (CHERPECK RICHARD E [US]) |