EP0758917 - STATIC MICROMIXER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Weberstrasse 5 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [1997/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUBERT, Klaus Geigersbergstrasse 54 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
BIER, Wilhelm Grabener Weg 10 76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | 03 /
LINDER, Gerd Stephan-Lochner-Weg 2 76149 Karlsruhe / DE | 04 /
SEIDEL, Dieter Württembergerstrasse 1 76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Rückert, Friedrich Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Stabsabteilung Innovation Postfach 36 40 76021 Karlsruhe / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [2009/27] | Rückert, Friedrich Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Weberstrasse 5 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [1997/09] | Rückert, Friedrich, Dr. Forschungszentrum Karlsruhe GmbH Stabsabteilung Patente und Lizenzen Weberstrasse 5 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 95906346.2 | 25.01.1995 | [1997/09] | WO1995EP00251 | Priority number, date | DE19944416343 | 09.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4416343 | [1997/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9530475 | Date: | 16.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758917 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758917 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/04 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
B01J19/0093 (EP,US);
B01F33/3012 (EP,US);
B01F25/23 (EP,US);
B01F25/4323 (EP,US);
B01F33/3017 (EP,US);
B01F33/3039 (EP,US);
B01F33/3045 (EP,US);
B01J19/2415 (EP,US);
F28D9/0037 (EP,US);
F28F3/048 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00121 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00159 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00783 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00873 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00889 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/09] | Title | German: | STATISCHER MIKRO-VERMISCHER | [1997/09] | English: | STATIC MICROMIXER | [1997/09] | French: | MICROMELANGEUR STATIQUE | [1997/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 26.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 04.03.1998 | PT | 04.06.1998 | IE | 24.09.1998 | [2002/10] |
Former [2001/23] | GR | 04.03.1998 | |
IE | 04.03.1998 | ||
PT | 04.06.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | IE | 04.03.1998 | |
PT | 04.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/47] | PT | 04.06.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE732632 (KRAFTANLAGEN AG); | [A]GB612012 (HARRY STEWART WHELLER); | [A]FR1261312 (SAINT GOBAIN); | [X]GB2073604 (MUNTERS AB CARL) [X] 1; | [A]EP0260736 (HOOGOVENS GROEP BV [NL]) |