EP0807864 - COLOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PRINTER AND SUCH METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/47] | COLOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PRINTER | ||
[2001/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | For all designated states HITACHI KOKI CO., LTD. 6-2, Ote-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
For all designated states HITACHI KOKI CO., LTD. 6-2, Ote-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | |||
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
For all designated states HITACHI KOKI CO., LTD. 6-2, Ote-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Shinya 46-17, Hamadacho Mito-shi Ibaraki 310 / JP | 02 /
SATOU, Kunio 8-11, Daiharacho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 03 /
OKANO, Mamoru Yuho Ryo 20-3, Ayukawacho 6-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 04 /
MASUDA, Kazuhito 19-3-202, Ishinazakacho 1-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 05 /
ADACHI, Masaya Yuho Ryo 20-3, Ayukawacho 6-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 06 /
HOSHI, Nobuyoshi 23-8, Higashiishikawa 3-chome Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312 / JP | [1997/47] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95906541.8 | 30.01.1995 | [1997/47] | WO1995JP00114 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9624091 | Date: | 08.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807864 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0807864 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.08.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/01 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
H04N1/508 (EP,US);
G03G15/0152 (EP,US);
G03G15/0163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1997/47] | Title | German: | ELEKTROPHOTOGRAPHISCHER FARBDRUCKER UND SOLCHE METHODE | [2001/38] | English: | COLOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PRINTER AND SUCH METHOD | [2001/38] | French: | IMPRIMANTE ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE COULEUR ET TEL PROCEDE | [2001/38] |
Former [1997/47] | ELEKTROPHOTOGRAPHISCHER FARBDRUCKER | ||
Former [1997/47] | COLOR ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PRINTER | ||
Former [1997/47] | IMPRIMANTE ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE COULEUR | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.1997 | Translation filed | 19.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1997 | Search fee paid | 19.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 26.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0606982 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5338631 (MASUBUCHI SADAO [JP]) [A] 1,8,9 * abstract *; | [A]US5223906 (HARRIS ELLIS D [US]) [A] 1,8,9 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH06115174 (XEROX CORP); | [A]JPS62188567 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JPS59164568 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH01102584 (RICOH KK); | [A]JPS63201671 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JPH0456946 (RICOH KK) |