EP0734479 - SYSTEM PREVENTING SPREAD OF FIRE AND SMOKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSTRUCTION CONSULTANTS AND CONTRACTORS, INC. P.O.Box 1737 Clarksville, VA 23927 / US | [1996/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARD, Thomas T. P.O. Box 1737 Clarksville, VA 23927 / US | [1997/10] |
Former [1996/40] | 01 /
WARD, Thomas, T. P.O. Box 1737 Clarksville, VA 23927 / US | Representative(s) | Woodward, John Calvin, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Woodward, John Calvin, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95906596.2 | 08.12.1994 | [1996/40] | WO1994US13855 | Priority number, date | US19930164068 | 09.12.1993 Original published format: US 164068 | [1996/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9516083 | Date: | 15.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0734479 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0734479 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.06.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E04B5/48, E04F17/00 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
A62C2/065 (EP,US);
E04F17/08 (EP,US);
F16L5/04 (EP,US);
H02G3/0412 (EP,US);
H02G3/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/40] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERMEIDUNG DER AUSBREITUNG VON FEUER UND RAUCH | [1996/40] | English: | SYSTEM PREVENTING SPREAD OF FIRE AND SMOKE | [1996/40] | French: | SYSTEME EMPECHANT LA PROPAGATION DU FEU ET DE LA FUMEE | [1996/40] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1996 | Search fee paid | 02.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 17.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.05.2000 | CH | 17.05.2000 | ES | 17.05.2000 | FR | 17.05.2000 | IT | 17.05.2000 | LI | 17.05.2000 | NL | 17.05.2000 | DK | 17.08.2000 | DE | 18.08.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
CH | 17.05.2000 | ||
ES | 17.05.2000 | ||
FR | 17.05.2000 | ||
LI | 17.05.2000 | ||
NL | 17.05.2000 | ||
DK | 17.08.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
CH | 17.05.2000 | ||
ES | 17.05.2000 | ||
LI | 17.05.2000 | ||
NL | 17.05.2000 | ||
DK | 17.08.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
CH | 17.05.2000 | ||
ES | 17.05.2000 | ||
LI | 17.05.2000 | ||
NL | 17.05.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
CH | 17.05.2000 | ||
ES | 17.05.2000 | ||
LI | 17.05.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
CH | 17.05.2000 | ||
LI | 17.05.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
CH | 17.05.2000 | ||
LI | 17.05.2000 | ||
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/24] | BE | 17.05.2000 | |
FR | 13.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | BE | 17.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4894966 (BAILEY PAUL R [CA], et al); | [A]US4237667 (JAROSZ GREGORY J [US], et al); | [A]US4918761 (HARBEKE GEROLD J [US]); | [AP]US5351448 (GOHLKE HENRY [US], et al) |