EP0685124 - CLICK/POP FREE BIAS CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION 1090 Kifer Road, M/S 16-135 Sunnyvale, CA 95086-3737 / US | [1995/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHAFFARIPOUR, Parviz 13521 Myren Drive Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al Bowles Horton Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95906669.7 | 15.12.1994 | [1995/49] | WO1994US14697 | Priority number, date | US19930168448 | 17.12.1993 Original published format: US 168448 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9517040 | Date: | 22.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685124 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/30 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
H03F1/305 (EP,US);
H03F1/30 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/49] | Title | German: | VORSPANNUNGSSCHALTUNG OHNE EINSCHALTSTÖRIMPULSE | [1995/49] | English: | CLICK/POP FREE BIAS CIRCUIT | [1995/49] | French: | CIRCUIT DE POLARISATION SANS BRUITS DE CLIQUETIS OU DE CLAQUEMENT | [1995/49] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 11.12.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS54138356 ; | [Y]US3832627 (OHSAWA M) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * column 6, line 4 - line 23; figure 6 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 20; figure 8 *; | [Y]EP0299665 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 28; figure 4 *; | [A]DE3936675 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 3,4,7,8 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 56; figures 5,7 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19791221), vol. 3, no. 156, Database accession no. (E - 161), & JP54138356 A 19791026 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) [A] 3,7 * abstract * | [A] - R. FORD, "A CIRCUIT FOR ELIMINATING ERRATIC SWITCH CONTACT OUTPUT", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS, SCHAUMBURG, ILLINOIS US, vol. 14, page 29, XP000276141 [A] 3,7 * the whole document * |