EP0741731 - PROCESS FOR EPOXIDISING PROCHIRAL OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/46] | PROCESS FOR EPOXIDISING PROCHIRAL OLEFINS AND A CATALYST THEREFOR AND INTERMEDIATES FOR MAKING THE CATALYST | ||
[2003/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham plc 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, David, SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals The Pinnacles, Coldharbour Road Harlow, Essex CM19 5AD / GB | 02 /
FINNEY, Frances, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. The Pinnacles, Coldharbour Road Harlow, Essex CM19 5AD / GB | 03 /
ATTRILL, Robin, Patrick, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. The Pinnacles, Coldharbour Road Harlow, Essex CM19 5AD / GB | 04 /
MILLER, David, SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceuticals The Pinnacles, Coldharbour Road Harlow, Essex CM19 5AD / GB | 05 /
TURNER, Gillian, SmithKline Beecham Pharmaceutical The Pinnacles, Coldharbour Road Harlow, Essex CM19 5AD / GB | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Lawton, Peter Philip GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Lawton, Peter Philip SmithKline Beecham plc, Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95907009.5 | 01.02.1995 | [1996/46] | WO1995EP00370 | Priority number, date | GB19940002213 | 04.02.1994 Original published format: GB 9402213 | GB19940002194 | 04.02.1994 Original published format: GB 9402194 | GB19940002200 | 04.02.1994 Original published format: GB 9402200 | GB19940011937 | 15.06.1994 Original published format: GB 9411937 | GB19940011936 | 15.06.1994 Original published format: GB 9411936 | GB19940011957 | 15.06.1994 Original published format: GB 9411957 | [1996/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9521172 | Date: | 10.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741731 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741731 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D493/04, C07F13/00, C07C47/565, C07C211/09, C07C251/24 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
C07D493/04 (EP,US);
C07C251/24 (EP,US);
C07C47/565 (EP,US);
C07C47/575 (EP,US);
C07C49/825 (EP,US);
C07C49/84 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/46] | Extension states | SI | 30.07.1996 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EPOXIDIEREN PROCHIRAL OLEFINE | [2003/45] | English: | PROCESS FOR EPOXIDISING PROCHIRAL OLEFINS | [2003/45] | French: | PROCEDE D'EPOXYDATION D'OLEFINES PROCHIRALES | [2003/45] |
Former [1996/46] | VERFAHREN ZUM EPOXIDIEREN PROCHIRAL OLEFINE KATALYSATOR DAFUR UND DESSEN ZWISCHENPRODUKTE | ||
Former [1996/46] | PROCESS FOR EPOXIDISING PROCHIRAL OLEFINS AND A CATALYST THEREFOR AND INTERMEDIATES FOR MAKING THE CATALYST | ||
Former [1996/46] | PROCEDE D'EPOXYDATION D'OLEFINES PROCHIRALES, CATALYSEUR UTILISE A CET EFFET ET INTERMEDIAIRES SERVANT A PRODUIRE CE CATALYSEUR | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Request for further processing for: | 18.10.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 18.10.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2002 | Decision despatched | 05.06.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2000 | Decision despatched | 02.07.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 20.07.1999 | Decision despatched | 09.03.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 16.04.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2004 | CH | 07.04.2004 | LI | 07.04.2004 | NL | 07.04.2004 | DK | 07.07.2004 | GR | 07.07.2004 | SE | 07.07.2004 | PT | 07.09.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
NL | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
DK | 07.07.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3787501 (KALLIANOS A, et al) [X] 14 * Examples I-V;; claim 1 *; | [X]DE2736523 (MONTEDISON SPA) [X] 14 * Examples 2-6,8,10-12;; claim 1 *; | [Y]US4861904 (SUGIE KIYOSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-13* claim 1 *; | [DY]EP0376524 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [DY] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [DY]WO9114694 (RES CORP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [DY] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]DE4238076 (FRAUENHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US5281578 (BRADLEY FONTAINE C [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [PY]WO9403271 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [PY] 1-13 * claim 1 * | [Y] - ZHANG ET AL, "Asymmetric Olefin Epoxidation with Sodium Hypochlorite Catalysed by Easily Prepared Mn (III) Salen Complexes", J.ORG.CHEM., vol. 56, pages 2296 - 2298 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0498194 | - ISHIHARA K. ET AL, "A NEW SCANDIUM COMPLEX AS AN EXTREMELY ACTIVE ACYLATION CATALYST", SYNLETT, (19960301), pages 265 - 266 | - IRIE R. ET AL, "Donor ligand effect in asymmetric epoxidation of unfuntionalized olefins with chiral salen complexes", SYNLETT, (1991), pages 265 - 266 |