EP0698270 - RECORD CARRIER AND DEVICE FOR READING SUCH A RECORD CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For:SE
PHILIPS NORDEN AB Kottbygatan 7, Kista 164 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:SE
PHILIPS NORDEN AB Kottbygatan 7, Kista 164 85 Stockholm / SE | |||
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:SE
PHILIPS NORDEN AB Kottbygatan 7, Kista 164 85 Stockholm / SE | |||
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:SE
PHILIPS NORDEN AB Kottbygatan 7, Kista S-164 85 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONS, Johannes, Jan Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [1996/09] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 95907127.5 | 14.02.1995 | [1996/09] | WO1995IB00101 | Priority number, date | EP19940200339 | 16.02.1994 Original published format: EP 94200339 | [1996/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9522824 | Date: | 24.08.1995 | [1995/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0698270 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0698270 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B20/18, H03M13/00 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
G11B20/12 (EP);
G11B20/1866 (EP);
H03M13/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/09] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGER UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM LESEN EINES DERARTIGEN TRÄGERS | [1996/09] | English: | RECORD CARRIER AND DEVICE FOR READING SUCH A RECORD CARRIER | [1996/09] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT ET DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE D'UN TEL SUPPORT | [1996/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/17] | 12.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4955022 (ODAKA KENTARO [JP]); | [A]GB2265047 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | Examination | WO9211635 |