EP0740733 - BUMP-RESISTANT DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOMAFA AB Box 509 S-301 80 Halmstad / SE | [1996/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTILSSON, Hans-Inge Braxenvägen 16 302 61 Halmstad / SE | 02 /
LARSSON, Nils Hakan Ivar Malstensvägen 8 302 59 Halmstad / SE | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Giver, Sören Bo, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Giver, Sören Bo, et al Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 95907177.0 | 17.01.1995 | [1996/45] | WO1995SE00036 | Priority number, date | SE19940000109 | 17.01.1994 Original published format: SE 9400109 | [1996/45] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9519486 | Date: | 20.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740733 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740733 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/24, E05D15/38, E05D13/00, E06B3/48 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
E06B3/485 (EP,US);
E05D15/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/45] | Title | German: | STOSSBESTÄNDIGE TÜR | [1996/45] | English: | BUMP-RESISTANT DOOR | [1996/45] | French: | PORTE RESISTANT AUX CHOCS | [1996/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1995 | Translation filed | 28.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 23.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.05.1999 | ES | 19.05.1999 | IT | 19.05.1999 | DK | 19.08.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/45] | BE | 19.05.1999 | |
ES | 19.05.1999 | ||
DK | 19.08.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | BE | 19.05.1999 | |
ES | 19.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 19.05.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4676293 (HANSSEN DAVID H [US]); | [A]US5163494 (MACNEIL DANIEL J [CA], et al); | [A]US5271448 (DELGADO JOE M [US]) |