EP0738119 - PROTECTIVE UNDER-CAP AND METHOD FOR LIPSTICK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oreal S.A 41 Rue Matre 92117 Clichey Cedex / FR | [2001/10] |
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states MAYBELLINE INTERMEDIATE CO. Suite 1300 1105 N. Market Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORD, John M. B. 337 Ericson Road Cordova, TN 38018 / US | 02 /
LUND, Doug M. 2265 Winding Path Drive Memphis, TN 38133 / US | 03 /
O'BRIEN, Bernard M. 2944 Carnton Drive Germantown, TN 38138 / US | [1997/11] |
Former [1996/43] | 01 /
FORD, John M. B. 337 Ericson Road Cordova, TN 38018 / US | ||
02 /
LUND, Doug M. 6961 Juanita Cr. S. Bartlett, TN 38133 / US | |||
03 /
O'BRIEN, Bernard M. 2944 Carnton Drive Germantown, TN 38138 / US | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 95907204.2 | 09.12.1994 | [1996/43] | WO1994US14110 | Priority number, date | US19930164712 | 10.12.1993 Original published format: US 164712 | [1996/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9515702 | Date: | 15.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738119 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738119 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.06.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/06 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
A45D40/06 (EP,US);
A45D40/00 (KR);
B65D51/18 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0015 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0078 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/43] | A45D40/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/43] | Extension states | LT | 05.07.1996 | Title | German: | SCHUTZUNTERKAPPE UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINEN LIPPENSTIFT | [1996/43] | English: | PROTECTIVE UNDER-CAP AND METHOD FOR LIPSTICK | [1996/43] | French: | SOUS-CAPUCHON DE PROTECTION ET PROCEDE POUR ROUGE A LEVRES | [1996/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1996 | Search fee paid | 05.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 13.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2000 | BE | 05.04.2000 | CH | 05.04.2000 | GR | 05.04.2000 | LI | 05.04.2000 | NL | 05.04.2000 | DK | 05.07.2000 | PT | 05.07.2000 | SE | 05.07.2000 | LU | 09.12.2000 | IE | 11.12.2000 | MC | 31.12.2000 | [2007/29] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
CH | 05.04.2000 | ||
GR | 05.04.2000 | ||
LI | 05.04.2000 | ||
NL | 05.04.2000 | ||
DK | 05.07.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
CH | 05.04.2000 | ||
LI | 05.04.2000 | ||
NL | 05.04.2000 | ||
DK | 05.07.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
CH | 05.04.2000 | ||
LI | 05.04.2000 | ||
NL | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
CH | 05.04.2000 | ||
LI | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
MC | 31.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/17] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
CH | 05.04.2000 | ||
LI | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
IE | 11.12.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
CH | 05.04.2000 | ||
LI | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/26] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
SE | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 05.04.2000 | |
BE | 05.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2608134 (BARETT SA [FR]) [A] 1-3,5,10,12,13,16* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4208144 (HULTGREN ERIC A [US], et al); | [Y]US4412630 (DAENEN ROBERT H C M [BE]); | [Y]US4579134 (MOORE ARTHUR H [US]); | [Y]FR2657822 (REBOUL SMT [FR]); | [Y]US5257704 (GUTT EDWARD S [US]) |