EP0743884 - DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM FOR AN UPPER BUNDLE STEAM GENERATOR CLEANING/INSPECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOSTER-MILLER, INC. 350 Second Avenue Waltham, Massachusetts 02154-1196 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states FOSTER-MILLER, INC. 350 Second Avenue Waltham Massachusetts 02154-1196 / US | ||
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states FOSTER-MILLER INC. 350 Second Avenue Waltham Massachusetts 02154-1196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHTON, Augustus, J., III 128 West Main Street Westboro, MA 01581 / US | 02 /
RUGGIERI, Steven, K. 19 Gordon Road Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 03 /
LOVETT, Timothy, J. 60 Highledger Avenue Wellesley, MA 02181 / US | 04 /
BRIGHTMAN, Alan 110 Green Street Bridgewater, MA 02324 / US | 05 /
JENS, Steve Apartment 1 50 Oakland Avenue Belmont, MA 02178 / US | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Jones, Graham H. Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath London SE3 7LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 95907209.1 | 07.12.1994 | [1996/48] | WO1994US14371 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9617695 | Date: | 13.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0743884 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0743884 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.06.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F28G3/16, F22B37/48, F22B37/00 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B08B9/023 (EP);
B08B9/093 (EP);
B65H75/34 (EP);
B65H75/36 (EP);
F16G13/16 (EP);
F16G13/20 (EP);
F16M11/14 (EP);
F16M11/18 (EP);
F16M11/24 (EP);
F16M11/40 (EP);
F22B37/002 (EP);
F22B37/483 (EP);
F28G15/04 (EP);
B65H2701/3911 (EP);
F16M2200/02 (EP);
F16M2200/08 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/48] | B08B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/48] | Title | German: | EINSATZSYSTEM EINER REINIGUNGS-/INSPEKTIONSEINRICHTUNG FÜR DIE OBEREN ROHRBÜNDEL EINES DAMPFERZEUGERS | [1996/48] | English: | DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM FOR AN UPPER BUNDLE STEAM GENERATOR CLEANING/INSPECTION DEVICE | [1996/48] | French: | SYSTEME DE MISE EN OEUVRE POUR DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE/CONTROLE DU FAISCEAU TUBULAIRE SUPERIEUR D'UN GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR | [2002/19] |
Former [1996/48] | SYSTEME DE MISE EN UVRE POUR DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE/CONTROLE DU FAISCEAU TUBULAIRE SUPERIEUR D'UN GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.1996 | Search fee paid | 01.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 18.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.02.2003 | BE | 19.02.2003 | CH | 19.02.2003 | GR | 19.02.2003 | IT | 19.02.2003 | LI | 19.02.2003 | NL | 19.02.2003 | DK | 19.05.2003 | PT | 19.05.2003 | SE | 19.05.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/10] | AT | 19.02.2003 | |
BE | 19.02.2003 | ||
CH | 19.02.2003 | ||
GR | 19.02.2003 | ||
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
NL | 19.02.2003 | ||
DK | 19.05.2003 | ||
PT | 19.05.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 19.02.2003 | |
CH | 19.02.2003 | ||
GR | 19.02.2003 | ||
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
NL | 19.02.2003 | ||
DK | 19.05.2003 | ||
PT | 19.05.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 19.02.2003 | |
CH | 19.02.2003 | ||
GR | 19.02.2003 | ||
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
NL | 19.02.2003 | ||
PT | 19.05.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | CH | 19.02.2003 | |
GR | 19.02.2003 | ||
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
NL | 19.02.2003 | ||
PT | 19.05.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 19.02.2003 | |
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
NL | 19.02.2003 | ||
PT | 19.05.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | CH | 19.02.2003 | |
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
NL | 19.02.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 19.02.2003 | |
LI | 19.02.2003 | ||
SE | 19.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/32] | SE | 19.05.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]US5265129 (BROOKS RAYMOND J [US], et al) [XD] 19,24 * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 10; figure - * [A] 1-3,13,26,28,30-33; | [A]DE4226854 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 24* column 2, line 12 - column 3, line 18; figure - * | International search | [A]US338310 ; | [A]US1905824 (MARTINIUS DYSTHE); | [A]US3120237 (LANG HENRY A); | [A]US3330105 (WEBER CHARLES H); | [A]US3599871 (RUPPEL DONALD B, et al); | [A]US3655122 (BROWN GEORGE A, et al); | [A]US4107001 (KINZLER RAYMOND CARL); | [Y]US4219976 (BURACK ROBERT D [US], et al); | [Y]US4384594 (MORITZ WERNER [DE]); | [A]US4392344 (GORDON EDMUND A, et al); | [A]US4424769 (CHARAMATHIEU ANDRE G [FR], et al); | [A]US4638667 (ZIMMER JOHN J [US], et al); | [A]US4691723 (MIERSWA CHRISTIAN [DE], et al); | [A]US4702281 (MORITZ WERNER [DE]); | [A]US4834069 (UMEDA HIROYUKI [JP]); | [A]US4844021 (STOSS JOHANNES [DE]); | [A]US4980120 (BOWMAN JAMES M [CA], et al); | [A]US5036871 (RUGGIERI STEVEN K [US], et al); | [A]US5065703 (LEE ROBERT A S [US]); | [A]US5172653 (VADAKIN THOMAS C [US]); | [A]US5178129 (CHIKAMA TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [A]US5194217 (ST LOUIS DANIEL M [US], et al) |