EP0737075 - ILEAL BILE ACID TRANSPORTER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY Medical Center Boulevard Winston-Salem, NC 27157-1023 / US | [1996/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAWSON, Paul A. 2111 Carriage Way Chapel Hill, NC 27514 / US | [1996/42] | Representative(s) | Wallinger, Michael, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Wallinger, Michael, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/46] | Wallinger, Michael, Dr.-Ing., et al Wallinger & Partner, Patentanwälte, Zweibrückenstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/40] | Wolhändler, Jacques Rechtsanwalt, Maria-Theresia-Str. 13/1 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/36] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1996/42] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95907214.1 | 29.12.1994 | [1996/42] | WO1994US14431 | Priority number, date | US19930176126 | 29.12.1993 Original published format: US 176126 | [1996/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9517905 | Date: | 06.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0737075 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.07.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N15/12, A61K38/17, C07K14/435 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
G01N33/92 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6897 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/42] | A61K38/17, C07K14/435, C12N15/00, C12N15/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/42] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen und Methoden den Ileum - Gallensäuretransporter betreffend | [1996/42] | English: | ILEAL BILE ACID TRANSPORTER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [1996/42] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES POUR LES TRANSPORTEURS DE L'ACIDE BILIAIRE ILEAL | [1996/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1996 | Search fee paid | 05.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/44] | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 31.07.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/39] | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/02] | 23.09.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/02] | Appeal following examination | 28.04.2003 | Appeal received No. T0769/03 | 27.06.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.09.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 23.09.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.09.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - WONG M.H. ET AL., "Cloning and characterization of the ileal bile acid transporter", HEPATOLOGY, (19931104), vol. 18, no. 4 Pt.2, page 143A, XP002070087 [X] 1,6-8,27-30,39-44 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0270-9139(93)90350-V | [X] - KARPEN S. ET AL., "Transcriptional regulation of the rat liver sodium-dependent bile acid transporter gene", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, (19930109), vol. SUPPL.17A, page 78, XP002070205 [X] 46,47 * abstract * | [PX] - WONG M.H. ET AL., "Cloning and chromosomal localization of the human ileal/renal sodium-dependent bile acid transporter", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (199404), vol. 106, no. suppl. 4, page A1009, XP002070118 [PX] 1,6-8,27-30,39-43 * abstract * | [PXD] - WONG M.H. ET AL., "Expression cloning and characterization of the hamster ileal sodium-dependent bile acid transporter", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19940114), vol. 269, no. 2, pages 1340 - 1347, XP002070086 [PXD] 1-4,6-36,39-43 * the whole document * | [PX] - Database EMBL, entry EMHUM1:HS10417 Accession number U10417 11 December 1994 100% identity with Seq.ID:3 (AC Q91109), XP002070119 [PX] 1-3,5,8,9,11-18,20-27,30-36 * the whole document * | [A] - KARPEN S. ET AL., "Functional analysis of the rat liver sinusoidal Na+-dependent bile acid transporter gene promoter", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (199304), vol. 104, no. 4, page A925, XP002070206 [A] 46,47 * abstract * | International search | [X] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, Volume 88, issued December 1991, B. HAGENBUCH et al., "Functional Expression Cloning and Characterization of the Hepatocyte Na+/Bile Acid Cotransport system", pages 10629-10633. |