EP0738128 - SYSTEM FOR INSERTING MATERIAL INTO CORNEAL STROMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Addition Technology, Inc 950 Lee Street, Suite 210 Des Plaines, Illinois / US | [2003/27] |
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states KERAVISION, INC. 48630 Milmont Drive Fremont, California 94538-7353 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHIS, Mark, L. 42770 Castillejo Court Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 02 /
SCHOLL, John, A. 14 Woodranch Circle Danville, CA 94506 / US | 03 /
PROUDFOOT, Robert, A. 3511 Tracy Drive Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 04 /
SILVESTRINI, Thomas, A. 1701 Las Trampas Road Alamo, CA 94507 / US | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95907297.6 | 06.01.1995 | [1996/43] | WO1995US00063 | Priority number, date | US19940178577 | 07.01.1994 Original published format: US 178577 | [1996/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9518569 | Date: | 13.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738128 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738128 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.07.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
A61F2/147 (EP,US);
A61F9/013 (EP,US);
A61B17/32053 (EP,US);
A61B2017/306 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/43] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM EINBRINGEN VON MATERIAL IN DIE KORNEALE STROMA | [1996/43] | English: | SYSTEM FOR INSERTING MATERIAL INTO CORNEAL STROMA | [1996/43] | French: | SYSTEME D'INSERTION D'UN MATERIAU DANS LE STROMA CORNEEN | [1996/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1996 | Search fee paid | 17.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 15.05.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2002 | 31.01.2003 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.09.2004 | BE | 01.09.2004 | CH | 01.09.2004 | LI | 01.09.2004 | NL | 01.09.2004 | DK | 01.12.2004 | GR | 01.12.2004 | SE | 01.12.2004 | IE | 06.01.2005 | LU | 06.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | [2007/16] |
Former [2006/24] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
BE | 01.09.2004 | ||
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
NL | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
IE | 06.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
BE | 01.09.2004 | ||
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
NL | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
BE | 01.09.2004 | ||
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
DK | 01.12.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
BE | 01.09.2004 | ||
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
CH | 01.09.2004 | ||
LI | 01.09.2004 | ||
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
GR | 01.12.2004 | ||
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 01.09.2004 | |
SE | 01.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 01.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4127112 (SHERLOCK HUGH P, et al) [A] 8* abstract *; | [A]WO8503217 (SCHLEGEL HANS JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 4 * abstract *; | [X]US4682597 (MYERS WILLIAM D [US]) [X] 8 * abstract *; | [Y]US4773415 (TAN BEN G [US]) [Y] 5-7 * column 3, line 24 - line 37; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US5094876 (GOLDBERG EUGENE P [US], et al) [Y] 7 * column 4, line 24 - line 51 * * column 7, line 3 - line 8 *; | [YA]EP0557128 (UNIV MIAMI [US]) [Y] 5-7 * the whole document * [A] 1-3 | International search | [A]WO8810096 (KERAVISION INC [US]); | [A]WO9320763 (KERAVISION INC [US]) |