EP0742937 - A SIGN SYSTEM AND A SUPPORT FOR SIGNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kontrapunkt A/S Christian Brygge 28 1559 Copenhagen V / DK | [1998/48] |
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states Kontrapunkt A/S Christian Brygge 28 DK-1559 Copenhagen V / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Anders Nybrogade 32 DK-1220 Copenhagen K / DK | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Wittrup, Flemming, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Wittrup, Flemming, et al c/o Hofman-Bang & Boutard A/S Adelgade 15 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 95908203.3 | 31.01.1995 | [1996/47] | WO1995DK00048 | Priority number, date | DK19510009400 | 31.01.1994 Original published format: DK 940051 | [1996/47] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520808 | Date: | 03.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742937 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742937 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G09F7/18 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
G09F7/18 (EP);
G09F2007/1834 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/47] | Title | German: | ANZEIGESYSTEM UND ANZEIGETRÄGER | [1996/47] | English: | A SIGN SYSTEM AND A SUPPORT FOR SIGNS | [1996/47] | French: | SYSTEME DE PANNEAUX VISUELS ET SUPPORT CORRESPONDANT | [1996/47] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.1995 | Translation filed | 28.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 28.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 30.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5212898 ; | [Y]FR727588 ; | [A]US4973212 |