EP0742889 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PARTIALLY RECONSTRUCTING THE LINING WALL OF STEEL CASTING LADLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wülfrather Feuerfest und Dolomitwerke GmbH & Co. KG. Wilhelmstrasse 77 42489 Wülfrath / DE | [1998/02] |
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states Dolomitwerke GmbH Wilhelmstrasse 77 D-42489 Wülfrath / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRIPP, Heinz, Werner Hans-Böckler-Strasse 7 D-46535 Dinslaken / DE | 02 /
RASIM, Wolfgang, A. RWE-Strasse 38 D-46485 Wesel / DE | 03 /
TIEMANN, Horst An der Pütterey 12 D-58640 Iserlohn / DE | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Thielmann, Andreas, et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Dusseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Thielmann, Andreas, et al Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95908261.1 | 03.02.1995 | [1996/47] | WO1995EP00398 | Priority number, date | DE19944403271 | 03.02.1994 Original published format: DE 4403271 | [1996/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9521363 | Date: | 10.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742889 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742889 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F27D1/16 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
F27D1/1626 (EP);
F27D2001/1605 (EP);
F27D2003/0001 (EP);
F27D2003/0036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, SE [1996/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TEILWEISEN WIEDERHERSTELLUNG DER WANDZUSTELLUNG VON STAHLGIESSPFANNEN | [1996/47] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PARTIALLY RECONSTRUCTING THE LINING WALL OF STEEL CASTING LADLES | [1996/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE RECONSTRUCTION PARTIELLE DE LA PAROI DE REVETEMENT DE POCHES A ACIER EN FUSION | [1996/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 04.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1998
14.07.1998
ADMISSIBLE Veitsch-Radex GmbH Mommsengasse 35 1040 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Becker, Thomas, et al, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1998
14.07.1998
ADMISSIBLE Veitsch-Radex GmbH Mommsengasse 35 1040 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [1998/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.1998
Veitsch-Radex Aktiengesellschaft für feuerfeste Erzeugnisse Mommsengasse 35 A-1040 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Becker, Thomas, et al, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | 07.08.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.12.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.07.2000 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2000 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 25.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 04.11.2000 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.10.1997 | SE | 01.01.1998 | [2008/06] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 01.10.1997 | |
SE | 01.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/21] | SE | 01.01.1998 | Cited in | International search | [Y]SU178955 (M.K.PAPIROV) [Y] 1 * See joined DW abstract*; | [Y]JPS53102803 ; | [A]JPS57190764 ; | [A]DE3006149 (FRINGS HERMANN H); | [A]US4094938 (KOLPAKOV SERAFIM VASILIEVICH, et al); | [A]BE693484 (REFRATECHNIK.ALBERT); | [A]FR1358186 (BETEILIGUNGS & PATENTVERW GMBH) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19781111), vol. 2, no. 136, Database accession no. (C - 78), & JP53102803 A 19780709 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830218), vol. 7, no. 41, Database accession no. (M - 194)<1186> , & JP57190764 A 19821124 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [A] * abstract * |