EP0740560 - CATHETER CONNECTOR AND METHOD FOR PORTAL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIMS DELTEC, INC. 1265 Grey Fox Road St. Paul Minnesota 55112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states SIMS DELTEC, INC. 1265 Grey Fox Road St. Paul, Minnesota 55112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAI, Qingsheng 2018 Knapp Avenue St. Paul, MN 55108 / US | 02 /
BELING, William, L. 655 Redwood Lane New Brighton, MN 55112 / US | 03 /
GLANTZ, Jerald 8085 39th Street North Lake Elmo, MN 55042 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Theodore, A. 554 Montrose Lane St. Paul, MN 55116 / US | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Belcher, Simon James, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [1996/45] | Wittrup, Flemming, et al c/o Hofman-Bang & Boutard, Lehmann & Ree A/S, Adelgade 15 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 95908543.2 | 20.01.1995 | [1996/45] | WO1995US00652 | Priority number, date | US19940184655 | 21.01.1994 Original published format: US 184655 | [1996/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9519802 | Date: | 27.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740560 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/02, A61M39/12 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
A61M39/0208 (EP,US);
A61M39/12 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0211 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1033 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/45] | Title | German: | KATHETERVERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER ZUSPRITZSTELLE | [1996/45] | English: | CATHETER CONNECTOR AND METHOD FOR PORTAL ASSEMBLY | [1996/45] | French: | RACCORD POUR CATHETER ET METHODE ASSOCIEE D'UTILISATION AVEC UNE PORTE DE PERFUSION | [1996/45] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 11.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/14] | 25.11.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4704103 (STOEBER HERBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-6,17,18,20,21,30,32,34,35,39,40,42 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 22; figure - * [Y] 2,3,7,10-16,19,22-25,29,31,33,43; | [XY]EP0343910 (SHILEY INFUSAID INC [US]) [X] 26,28,39-41 * column W * [Y] 2,3,11-13,15,16,19,23,25,29,31,33,45; | [XY]DE4129781 (HAINDL HANS [DE]) [X] 44 * abstract * [Y] 7,10,22,24,25,43,45; | [XY]US4673394 (FENTON JR PAUL V [US], et al) [X] 28 * column 5, line 3 - line 37; figure - * [Y] 14; | [XA]US4692146 (HILGER GERALD E [US]) [X] 26 * column W * [A] 2,3,12,19,23,25,28,29,33,36,37,45; | [A]FR2628639 (MICROTECHNIC SA [MC]) [A] 1-45 * figure - *; | [A]US5213574 (TUCKER ELTON M [US]) [A] 13 * figure - * |