EP0741530 - RATCHET-TYPE BUCKLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BURTON CORPORATION 80 Industrial Parkway Burlington, VT 05401 / US | [1996/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODGE, David 2 Golden Rod Lane Williston, Vermont 05495 / US | [1998/42] |
Former [1996/46] | 01 /
DODGE, David 33 Harbor View Rd Apt 1103 South Burlington, VT 05403-8703 / US | Representative(s) | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95908781.8 | 25.01.1995 | [1996/46] | WO1995US01349 | Priority number, date | US19940188553 | 27.01.1994 Original published format: US 188553 | [1996/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520334 | Date: | 03.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741530 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741530 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.08.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A43C11/00, A44B11/00, A43C11/14 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
A63C10/06 (EP,US);
A43C11/00 (EP,US);
A43C11/146 (EP,US);
A63C10/04 (EP,US);
A63C10/24 (EP,US);
Y10T24/21 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/46] | A43C11/00, A44B11/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, ES, IT, LI, NL [1996/46] | Title | German: | KLICKVERBINDUNG | [1996/46] | English: | RATCHET-TYPE BUCKLE | [1996/46] | French: | FIXATION A CLIQUET | [1996/46] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.1996 | Search fee paid | 16.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 10.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 19.12.2001 | ES | 27.06.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 19.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4683620 (VALSECCHI CARLO [IT], et al); | [Y]US3258820 (SUSSMAN STEINBERG ADALBERTO); | [Y]US2271452 (CARROLL ELBERT H); | [Y]US3662435 (ALLSOP IVOR J); | [Y]US4670946 (OLIVIERI OLIVIERO [IT]); | [Y]US4453290 (RIEDEL TILO H [AT]); | [Y]US4310951 (RIEDEL TILO H); | [Y]US357287 ; | [Y]FR1406052 (PYRAPLASTIC); | [Y]US5083350 (SANDREID ALF J [DK]); | [Y]US4326320 (RIEDEL TILO H); | [Y]US4193171 (LICHOWSKY ABRAHAM [US]); | [Y]US4796337 (MARXER HERBERT [LI]); | [Y]US4547980 (OLIVIERI OLIVIERO [IT]) |